Zhang v. Johnson & Johnson Inc.
Plaintiff: Daqing (Jackie) Zhang
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01717
Filed: April 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE re 53 Stipulation. The Court terminates any remaining pending motions, deadlines and hearings. The Clerk shall close this file. Motions terminated: 34 MOTION to Compel filed by Daqing (Jackie) Zhang, 43 First MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by Daqing (Jackie) Zhang. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/12/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Taking 43 Matter off Calendar re 51 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 30, 2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Continuing Hearing Date on Motion to Compel Depositions to April 19, 2011, re 45 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 11, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/28/11. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO THE PARTIES' MEDIATION DEADLINE re 31 Stipulation. Mediation deadline set for 3/22/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FURTHER ORDER re 12 Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/1/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 17 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO ADD JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL re 8 Stipulation. The Plaintiff shall file her Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry within ten days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang v. Johnson & Johnson Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daqing (Jackie) Zhang
Represented By: Kathryn Burkett Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca Kim Kimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?