Salsman v. ACCESS Systems Americas, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Salsman
Defendant: ACCESS Systems Americas, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01865
Filed: April 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 73 Motion for Summary Judgment (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 66 Motion to Dismiss (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Setting Deadline To Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge or To Request Reassignment to a District Judge. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 23, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Terminating Referral to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 7, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 54 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/22/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Vacating Deadline for Parties to Complete ADR. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/20/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or to Strike. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/20/10. CMC Continued to 2:00 p.m. on August 3, 2010.(pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salsman v. ACCESS Systems Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Salsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCESS Systems Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?