Brown-Kyes v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Georgia C Brown-Kyes
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., GMAC Mortgage, LLC, AllAmerican Mortgage & Properties, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, ETS Services, LLC, Aurora Loan Services and US Bank N.A. Trustee
Case Number: 5:2010cv01986
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to 19 Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/28/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned to a District Court Judge; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 and 14 That Case Be Dismissed Without Prejudice for Failure to Prosecute. Objections due by 4/8/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/25/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Failure to Prosecute. Plaintiff's counsel, Stephen Ruehmann, to appear and show cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/30/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/28/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown-Kyes v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia C Brown-Kyes
Represented By: Marc A. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllAmerican Mortgage & Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETS Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank N.A. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?