Arnold v. PNS Stores Inc.
Plaintiff: Connie Arnold
Defendant: PNS Stores Inc. and 200 Serra Way LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv01987
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel and Setting Initial CMC for July 27, 2011 at 2 p.m. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/24/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Requested Extension. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/21/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Vacating Hearing on Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/20/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011).
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/24/2011 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/14/2011. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/14/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. PNS Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Arnold
Represented By: Julie Ostil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNS Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 200 Serra Way LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?