Johnson v. Wachovia Bank FSB et al
Plaintiff: Lamont Johnson
Defendant: Wachovia Bank FSB, Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., ETS Services, LLC and Regional Trustee Services Corp
Case Number: 5:2010cv02028
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/19/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Plaintiff's Pro Se Status. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/26/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Referring this Case to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for Consideration of Whether Case Is Related to Case No. C07-04497 JF; and Continuing Case Management Conference to September 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/3/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wachovia Bank FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETS Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Trustee Services Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?