Genentech, Inc. v. Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
Plaintiff: Genentech, Inc.
Defendant: Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 5:2010cv02037
Filed: May 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER re 706 Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/8/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 701 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 700 Stipulated Request to Vacate Trial Date.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER re 687 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing the Parties to Bring Equipment and Other Materials into the Courtroom for Trial filed by Genentech, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/6/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 674 [Tentative] Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/4/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 656 [Tentative] Preliminary Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/1/12. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 636 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 616 Motion to Shorten Time.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 469 Motion for Summary Adjudication; denying 509 Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 559 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT re 564 Proposed Order filed by Genentech, Inc.. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/18/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 553 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 552 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 537 Motion to Shorten Time; granting in part and denying in part 540 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Denying as moot 549 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/11/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER Regarding Trial Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/19/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 487 Discovery Letter Brief, Motion to Strike (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER Regarding Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/14/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 483 , 502 Motion to Strike, and denying 486 Motion to Compel (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal Denying 447 Motion to Strike and Denying 462 Motion to Strike (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 450 Motion to Strike Late-Disclosed Expert Reports (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 436 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 442 Motion ; denying 443 Motion to Shorten Time (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 430 AMENDED ORDER re 423 Order Denying Administrative Motions. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/14/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 427 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER re 424 Case Management Statement filed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania Further Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/9/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the University's Letter Brief Motion to Compel re: Roche and Exhibits A to E, N and P thereto filed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, 394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A & B to the Declaration of James A High, Jr. ISO of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Regarding Dr. Okudaira filed by Genentech, Inc., 336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief and Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Genentech, Inc., 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Genentech's Request to Reopen Argument and Exhibit D Thereto filed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/7/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re 361 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Sam Milstein In Support of Plaintiff's Letter Brief Seeking A Determination As To Privilege filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/6/2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER DENYING 396 Letter Brief filed by Genentech, Inc. AND DENYING 395 Letter Brief, filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/30/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 414 Stipulation filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/21/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER Setting Modified Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/17/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STIPULATED AGREEMENT ON BRIEFING SCHEDULE CHANGE FOR RESPONSES TO GENENTECH'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND ORDER, re 400 Stipulation, filed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/10/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER Granting-In-Part 339 MOTION to Compel re: Roche filed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 11/7/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER re 375 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to UPenn's Motion to Compel re: Roche Documents filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/31/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 381 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 380 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 372 Stipulation filed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/25/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/24/2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, ORDER re 344 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/21/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 330 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 349 Motion to Compel (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 360 Stipulation, filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/17/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re 330 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (A) PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ADDITIONAL DEPOSITION TIME AND (B) CERTAIN EXHIBITS THERETO filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/13/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 335 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 334 Stipulation filed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 10/6/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 327 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/19/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER denying 293 Motion For Relief From Magistrate Judge Order (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Case Management Conference Set for 9/9/2011 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/31/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 314
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/30/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER re 299 , 287 Declaration in Opposition to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal University Letter Brief Motion to Compel and Supporting Exhibits U & X, filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 19, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Order by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion to Compel.(psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Order by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 258 Motion to Compel and denying 256 Motion for a Protective Order.(psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Disregard. Unsigned Order. See 268 . (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011) Modified on 6/10/2011 (psglc2, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 186 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Tentative Order Regarding Leave to Amend and Setting Case Management Conference to Follow May 12, 2011 Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/10/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Construing Disputed Claim Terms of U.S. Patent No. 6,733,752. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/9/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Requesting that Parties Provide Lodato Reference to Court by 10 a.m. May 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/5/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 116 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Further ORDER Regarding 116 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/22/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Approving Stipulation (Dkt. No. 141). Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/11/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 126 Motion to Strike, granting curative measures. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Granting 142 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 9, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting 132 Stipulated Request To Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 7, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 116 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/28/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Approving Party Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/25/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting Stipulated Extension re 114 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 16, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order to Extend Deadlines re 87 Stipulation, filed by Genentech, Inc., Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 2, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Regarding Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/1/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting Stipulated Extension, re 79 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 14, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting Stipulated Extension. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/12/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 Stipulation, filed by Genentech, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 29, 2010. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Further Extending Deadline for Genentech to File Objections to the Court's November 22 Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/15/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Adopting Parties' Stipulation re Technical Experts. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/10/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal Granting-in-Part and Denying-in-Part 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Patent Local Rule 3-1. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Adopting Parties' Stipulation Regarding Technical Experts. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/10/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information And/or Trade Secrets re 47 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/6/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Signing Stipulation Extending Date to Object to November 22, 2010 Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/7/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Comply with Portion of the Court's November 22, 2010 Order. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/6/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Extending Date to File Joint Case Management Statement per Stipulation of Parties. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/2/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 24 Parties' Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/19/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Setting Deadlines for Claim Construction Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing, and Briefing, per Stipulation of Parties. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/18/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 08/24/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (PRIVATE ADR) re 12 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation filed by Genentech, Inc., Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/30/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genentech, Inc. v. Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Ritter Bleharski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Gary N. Frischling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?