Convergence Technologies (USA), LLC v. Microloops Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Convergence Technologies (USA), LLC
Defendant: Microloops Corporation, The Hewlett-Packard Company and Dynatron Corporation
Case Number: 5:2010cv02051
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Stay. This case STAYED in its entirety pending final exhaustion of the currently-pending inter parties reexamination proceeding, including any appeals. The claim construction hearing scheduled for 5/3/2012 is VACATED . The Clerk shall administratively close this case.The parties shall submit a joint status report apprising the court of the status of the reexamination proceedings on 10/1/2012 and every sixth months thereafter.The parties shall also provide notice to the court within one week of final exhaustion of the pending reexamination proceeding, including appeals. In the notice, the parties shall request that this matter be reopened and that a case management conference be scheduled.Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/12/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 141 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RESET HEARING. Having reviewed the moving, responding and reply papers filed for the Motion to Stay, the court finds it appropriate for determination without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). Accordingly, the hearing scheduled for 4/6/2012 is VACATED. A written decision on the Motion to Stay shall issue in short order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 134 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Timothy Paar Walker for Inventec Corporation added. Attorney Hemant (Shashi) Hari Kewalramani and Russell Wong terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/2/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Tutorial and Claims Construction hearing scheduled for 1/3/2012, is VACATED and re-scheduled to 5/3/2012, at 9:00 a.m. for one full day. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/27/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply to this case: Tutorial and Claims Construction Hearing due 1/3/2012 at 9:00 AM. Designation of Opening Experts with Reports - 4 weeks (28 days) after date of claims construction (Markman) order; Designation of Rebuttal Experts with Reports - 8 weeks (56 days) after Markman order; Expert Discovery Cutoff - 11 weeks (77 days) after Markman order; Fact Discovery Cutoff - 11 weeks (77 days) after Markman order; Dead line(s) for Filing Discovery Motions - See Civil Local Rule 37-3; Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions - 14 weeks (98 days) after Markman order. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AMENDED ORDER on Motion to Appear by Telephone re 85 Order. The September 16, 2011 Case Management Conference remains on calendar. The parties are permitted to appear by telephone at the September 16, 2011 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact Court Call to set up the appearance. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER SETTING INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MARKMAN HEARING. Interim Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2011. Interim Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Tutorial and Markman hearing set for 1/3/2012 09:00 AM - 12:00 PM, 01:30 - 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. The Court anticipates that the hearing will be moved to Courtroom 4 on the same floor; the parties are advised to check the court website or calendar immediately prior to the hearing to confirm the location. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/22/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 76 Notice (Other). Plaintiff's Counsel is directed to contact CourtCall to set up the telephonic appearance for the June 15, 2011 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/10/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the fact that both parties are prepared for the April 15 tutorial and hearing, the Court finds that a Case Management Conference is not necessary at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the March 7 Conference. The Court will set this case for a future Case Management Conference in its Claim Construction Order, if necessary. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Convergence Technologies (USA), LLC v. Microloops Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Convergence Technologies (USA), LLC
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microloops Corporation
Represented By: Eric Hugh Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Eric Hugh Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynatron Corporation
Represented By: Eric Hugh Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?