Dang v. Sutter's Place, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cuc Dang
Defendant: Sutter's Place, Inc. and Unite Here! Local 19
Case Number: 5:2010cv02181
Filed: May 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/28/13. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 234 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 261 STIPULATION AND ORDER 260 Re: Pending Trial Matters. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/8/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion for Discovery (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 189 Stipulation(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 116 Motion in Limine; temporarily granting 117 Motion in Limine; granting 118 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 124 Motion i n Limine; granting 125 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion in Limine; granting 127 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion in Limine; denying 129 Motion in Limine; granting 130 Motion in Limine; temporarily granting 131 Motion in Limine; denying 132 Motion in Limine; granting 133 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion in Limine (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER 190 to Set a New Trial Date: Jury Trial set for 4/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/24/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 143 Motion to Shorten Time. Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction is due on Wednesday, August 22, 2012 at noon.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER 111 to Continue the Deadline to File the Joint Pretrial Conference Statement and Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/20/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Summary Judgment.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DENYING THIRD-PARTY UNITE HERE! LOCAL 19'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 71 Motion for Attorney Fees (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 96 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER 77 to Continue Trial Deadlines Re: Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/2/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF re 79 Stipulation filed by Cuc Dang. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 20, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF re 63 Stipulation filed by Sutter's Place, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 12, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER 60 Approving Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/2/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 52 Stipulation filed by Sutter's Place, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 5, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER 47 to Further Extend ADR Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/3/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER 41 to Extend ADR Deadline. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/22/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER 38 of Dismissal of Defendant Unite Here! Local 19, Unite Here! Local 19 terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/22/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 19 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER 31 Selecting ADR Process. Private Mediation Selected and Mediation to be Completed by 12/31/2010. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/26/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dang v. Sutter's Place, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuc Dang
Represented By: Ann Anh Phuong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter's Place, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unite Here! Local 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?