Vierra v. Hunt
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mary Vierra
Defendant: Stephen J Hunt and The Fanin Group
Case Number: 5:2010cv02239
Filed: May 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER That Case Be Reassigned. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 28, 2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT, SCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, AND FURTHER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 12/14/10 2:00 PM Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 2/22/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/8/10. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2010: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Further Continuing Case Management Conference, Directing the Clerk of the court to Enter Defendants Default, Subject to the Default Being Set Aside in the Event Defendant Files Either an Answer or Rule 12 Motion No Later than November 30, 2010. CMC set for 2:00 p.m. on December 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/9/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference; and Directing Plaintiff to Properly Serve Defendant. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/31/10. CMC Continued to 11/16/10 at 2:00 p.m. CMC Statements due by 11/9/10.(pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vierra v. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Mary Vierra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fanin Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?