Manoutchehr Movassate and Jaleh Movassate v. Dudley Ridge Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Manoutchehr Movassage and Jaleh Movassate
Defendant: Dudley Ridge Properties, LLC, PECO Controls Corporation, Lost Hills LLC, Colliers International Asset Management, Inc, Mark P Zamudio and Chris C Twardus
Case Number: 5:2010cv02313
Filed: May 26, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9601 CERCLA
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 47 Granting Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/16/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Regarding January 27, 2011 Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/19/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 47 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 12/6/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading as to Peco Controls Corporation re 20 Stipulation. Response due 8/30/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/23/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manoutchehr Movassate and Jaleh Movassate v. Dudley Ridge Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manoutchehr Movassage and Jaleh Movassate
Represented By: Edward David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dudley Ridge Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECO Controls Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lost Hills LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colliers International Asset Management, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark P Zamudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris C Twardus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?