Biagas v. Walker
Plaintiff: Vincent James Biagas
Defendant: James Walker
Case Number: 5:2010cv02429
Filed: June 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 32 Order. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/30/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 20 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Corpus Petition as Untimely filed by James Walker. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/30/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 12 Declaration in Support filed by Vincent James Biagas. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/18/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 4 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biagas v. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent James Biagas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?