Rodan & Fields, LLC v. The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rodan & Fields, LLC
Defendant: The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. and Clinique Laboratories, LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv02451
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 67 GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY CASE THROUGH DECEMBER 20, 2010. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/28/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re 8 and 31 DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The motion hearing currently scheduled for 10/7/2010 is VACATED. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/7/2010 at 1:30PM remains as set. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/5/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/20/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodan & Fields, LLC v. The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodan & Fields, LLC
Represented By: Cedric C. Chao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.
Represented By: Seth Isaac Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinique Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Seth Isaac Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?