Zepeda v. Paypal, Inc.

Plaintiff: Moises Zepeda
Defendant: Paypal, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv02500
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 333 Amended Objection filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/2/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER GRANTING 326 STIPULATION Setting Final Approval Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/6/26. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER GRANTING 324 STIPULATION Vacating Final Approval Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule. The parties shall submit their proposed, revised schedule for the Final Approval Hearing and related dates and deadlines within 14 days of the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/10/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR AT FINAL APPROVAL HEARING. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/17/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Order by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 275 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Re: Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/29/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015) Modified on 7/30/2015 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2015 03:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/20/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 243 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Jeffrey Leon. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 232 Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE 225 Objection: Responses due by 5/16/2014; Replies due by 5/23/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/1/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 200 Motion to Intervene (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING re 220 Letter filed by Paypal, Inc., for Benjamin Potter to appear by phone on 4/25/15 at 2:00 PM for hearing on the Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 215 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT AN AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 209 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT AN AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 AMENDED NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING AND ORDER as to 200 Second MOTION to Intervene to file amended complaint. Responses due by 3/21/2014. Replies due by 3/28/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 02:00 PM* in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/11/14. *Amended to correct time from 9:30 AM to 2:00 PM.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO ORDER OF REFERENCE, AMENDING ORDER OF REFERENCE, AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/7/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown ArmstrongDENYING PLAINTIFFS 166 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ( terminating 167 Stipulation; terminating 194 Motion for Leave to File) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER REFERRING 200 SECOND MOTION TO INTERVENE AND AMEND COMPLAINT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH SPERO. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/14/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/13/2014 Denying 198 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 183 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND TRANSFER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG terminating 168 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER re 162 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/15/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 152 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER STRIKING 142 Notice of Appearance filed by Reginald Burgess. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/26/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 AMENDED ORDER re 94 MOTION to Intervene and for Stay of Proceedings filed by Fred Rickel, Amy Rickel. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG striking 94 Motion to Intervene (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 74 STIPULATION Vacating Hearing Date on Intervener's Motion to Intervene and Strike Zepeda's Class Allegations filed by Paypal, Inc., 66 First MOTION to Intervene and strike class allegations in Zepeda action filed by Ira Gilman, Shaul Behr, Michael Zinger, Fred Rickel, Amy Rickel, Vadim Tsigel, Devinda Fernando, Lacy Reintsma.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/20/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RELATED CASE ORDER. C 10-01668 JF and C 10-02500 EJD Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/22/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Stipulated Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2011. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO VACATE PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINre 56 Stipulation. The Court shall reschedule Plaintiffs' deadline to file a Second Amended Complaint at the Case Management Conference set for August 19, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., or such other date and time as is convenient for the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 50 . Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/23/11. (dlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 26 , 28 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO APPOINT INTERIM LEAD, LIASON, AND CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/14/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (approving 42 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/12/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION OF DEFENDANTS PAYPAL, INC. TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 37 ). Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2010 at 9:00 AM. The Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 is RESET for 1/21/2010 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/21/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference re 19 . Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/12/10. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 9 Stipulation. Response due 8/16/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zepeda v. Paypal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Zepeda
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paypal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?