J.H. et al v. Baldovinos et al
Petitioner: J.H. and Belinda A. Kirk
Respondent: Yolanda Baldovinos, Alameda County Social Services/Children and Family Services, Tracey Ferandez, Shirley Lee-Andrade, Darryl Evora, Jason Hess, Rhonda Malone, Larry Echo Hawk, Bureau of Indian Affairs, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Ronald M. George, Jon R. Rolefson and Trina Thompson
Case Number: 5:2010cv02507
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on August 9, 2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Order re: Administrate Matters by Hon. Lucy H. Koh (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER Regarding Pro Bono Cost Request. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/12/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting Respondents' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 196 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 226 Motion to Continue (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 225 Stipulation (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 193 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; and Ordering Parties to Meet and Confer and Submit a Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 REDACTION of 55 Order Denying Motion to Dismiss in Part, Remanding in Part, and Dismissing Certain Respondents, pursuant to Order 72 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/21/10. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 185 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 103 Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting Administrative Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/2/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011).
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 85 Ex Parte Application To Shorten Time (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/21/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting Stipulation re Hearing Date on Motion to Strike Jury Demand, as Modified. Hearing is set for March 31, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff's Opposition is due on February 10, 2011. Defendants' Reply is due on February 17, 2011. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/19/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Appointing Plaintiff Pro Bono Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/3/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Mailing)(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Directing Counsel to Serve Order and Provide Current Address for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/2/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Referring Plaintiff to Federal Pro Bono Project. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/1/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.H. et al v. Baldovinos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J.H.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Belinda A. Kirk
Represented By: Alicia Cee Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Yolanda Baldovinos
Represented By: Mary Ellyn Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alameda County Social Services/Children and Family Services
Represented By: Mary Ellyn Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tracey Ferandez
Represented By: Mary Ellyn Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shirley Lee-Andrade
Represented By: Mary Ellyn Gormley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darryl Evora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rhonda Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Echo Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald M. George
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jon R. Rolefson
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Trina Thompson
Represented By: Daniel J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?