Chan v. Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Chan
Defendant: Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company, ZC Sterling Insurance Agency, Inc and Zurich
Case Number: 5:2010cv02528
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Civil L. R. 7-1(b). For the reasons described below, the Court grants Defendants' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on July 29, 2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) for (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 19 defendants' motion to compel initial disclosures and discovery. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management statement due by 11/22/2010. In light of Plaintiff's pro se status, Plaintiff may file a se parate Statement if he so desires. However, Plaintiff must demonstrate to the Court that he is prosecuting this action. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Plaintiff's case management statement due by 8/24/2010. Each party's consent or declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge due by 8/24/2010. Initial case management conference continued to 8/31/2010, 1:30 p.m. Defendants shall be prepared to discuss jurisdictional issues at conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/19/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan v. Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZC Sterling Insurance Agency, Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?