Wesblatt v. Apple, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Adam Wesblatt
Defendant: Apple, Inc, AT&T, Inc. and AT&T Mobility, LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv02553
Filed: June 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 FINAL APPROVAL ORDER 203 Regarding ATTM Settlement. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/11/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER 183 Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement as to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/26/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER 179 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/28/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER 175 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER 173 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/8/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER 168 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/9/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 165 Stipulation (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER 163 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/18/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER 161 Continuing Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/22/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER 159 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER 157 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/21/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER 155 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/13/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER 152 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/11/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER 148 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/8/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION AND ORDER 144 Continuing Case Management Conference: Further Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/12/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 119 Motion to Strike. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose..(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER 140 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/20/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER 138 Extending Apple's Time is Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/23/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER 135 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/6/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER 132 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/10/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER 125 Extending Apple's Time to Respond to First Amended Master Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allison Stacy Elgart terminated.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER 98 to Continue the Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/16/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER 89 for Consolidation of C-11-01875-RMW. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/31/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER 64 for Consolidation. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/15/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER 16 for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/30/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER 53 for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/18/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER On Motion to Compel Arbitration Or, In The Alternative, To Stay Case 23 Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/18/2010. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010) Case Management Conference reset to Friday, December 17 at 10:30 a.m. Modified on 10/18/2010 (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER 41 of Dismissal of AT&T, Inc. Without Prejudice, AT&T, Inc. Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/22/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesblatt v. Apple, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Wesblatt
Represented By: Allison Stacy Elgart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?