Language Line Services, Inc. v. Language Services Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Language Line Services, Inc.
Defendant: Language Services Associates, LLC, William Schwartz and Patrick Curtin
Case Number: 5:2010cv02605
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2011 Filing 217 AMENDED NOTIFICATION INFORMATION re 213 Notice of Appeal : Filing fee: PAID on 11/16/11, receipt number 34611067067 (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to Monday, November 28, 2011 at 3:30 p.m. Pacific time. Call-in information remains the same. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 34611067067 re 213 Notice of Appeal filed by Language Services Associates, LLC (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled for 11/17/11 has been taken off calendar and will be rescheduled, if necessary, at a later date. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 Filing 216 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 213 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 USCA appeal notification form, # 4 appeal fee request)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 Filing 215 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 Filing 214 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 11, 2011 Filing 213 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 206 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Language Services Associates, LLC. Filing fee: PAID on 11/16/11, receipt number 34611067067.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2011) Modified on 11/17/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2011 Filing 212 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED (WRONG EVENT), DISREGARD - SEE DOC 213 NOTICE by Language Services Associates, LLC re 206 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Defendant's Notice of Appeal of October 13, 2011 Order Denying Modification of Preliminary Injunction (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 11/11/2011) Modified on 11/16/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2011 ADR Clerk Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/9/11 at 9:00 a.m. Pacific time. The court will provide instructions for connecting to the call in a separate notice to the parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER re 210 Stipulation filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas Discovery due by 4/19/2012. Motions due by 6/25/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/25/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 21, 2011 Filing 210 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DISCOVERY AND RELATED DATES by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 207 Stipulation, filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/18/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 208 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 17, 2011 Filing 207 STIPULATION CONTINUING EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES PENDING (A) PARTIES' STIPULATION ON DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND RELATED DATES, OR (B) COURT'S RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND RELATED DATES by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 194 Motion; overruling defendant's objections to special master's discovery orders no. 6 and 7 (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 154 Motion to Strike (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 204 RESPONSE (re 194 MOTION Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 re 191 Objection, 192 Objection, Application for Order Scheduling Hearing R MOTION Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 re 191 Objection, 192 Objection, Application for Order Scheduling Hearing R MOTION Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 re 191 Objection, 192 Objection, Application for Order Scheduling Hearing R ) PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 DISCOVERY ORDER NOS. 6 & 7 filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 203 RESPONSE to re 192 Objection, PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S OBJECTION TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 7 REGARDING CIVIL CONTEMPT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 202 RESPONSE to re 191 Objection, PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S OBJECTION TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 DISCOVERY ORDER #6 RECOMMENDING THE DENIAL OF MOTION TO VACATE AND/OR MODIFY THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 200 Request for Judicial Notice re 199 Reply to Opposition/Response, PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS REPLY TO MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERCLAIM AND EACH CLAIM FOR RELIEF THEREIN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PRCOEDURE SECTION 425.16; REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 199 ) (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 199 REPLY (re 153 MOTION to Strike COUNTERCLAIM AND EACH CLAIM FOR RELIEF THERIN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES ) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 198 REPLY (re 154 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS UNDER FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS UNDER FRCP 12(f) ) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 197 REPLY (re 152 MOTION to Dismiss LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) ) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 196 DEFENDANT BRYAN LUCAS'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF 152 MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PRCOEDURE 12(b)(2)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 10/3/2011) Modified on 10/5/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2011 Filing 195 ERRATA re 194 MOTION Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 re 191 Objection, 192 Objection, Application for Order Scheduling Hearing R MOTION Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 re 191 Objection, 192 Objection, Application for Order Scheduling Hearing R MOTION Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 re 191 Objection, 192 Objection, Application for Order Scheduling Hearing R NOTICE OF ERRATA RE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING REGARDING LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 DISCOVERY ORDER NOS. 6 & 7 [DKT NO. 194] by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Application for Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 194 MOTION Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 re 191 Objection, 192 Objection, Application for Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 193 Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in Support of 191 Objection, 192 Objection, Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang In Support of Language Services Assciates, Inc.'s Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 With Redacted Exhibits filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to G to Redacted Declaration, # 2 Exhibit H to P to Redacted Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Q to Y to Redacted Declaration)(Related document(s) 191 , 192 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 192 OBJECTIONS to re 169 Special Masters Order Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Redacted Objection to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order No. 7 Regarding Civil Contempt; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 191 OBJECTIONS to re 168 Special Masters Order Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Redacted Objection to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order No. 6 Regarding Vacating or Modifying the Injunction [Dkt. No. 168]; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 190 NOTICE by Language Services Associates, LLC re 189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Unredacted Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 and Exhibits to Supporting Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang NOTICE OF LODGING OF CONFIDENTIAL UNREDACTED OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S SEPTEMBER 8, 2011 DISCOVERY ORDER NOS. 6 & 7 AND DECLARATION OF CHERYL S. CHANG IN SUPPORT (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Unredacted Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 and Exhibits to Supporting Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang In Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Objections to the Special Master's September 8, 2011 Discovery Order Nos. 6 & 7 and Exhibits Supporting Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 187 Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in Support of 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in Support of Language Line Services, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits B & C to Declaration of Paul Murphy filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 180 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Marino (Marino, Christopher) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 177 Ex Parte Application (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 170 Stipulation filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Patrick Curtin, Bryan Lucas, William Schwartz. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/16/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 183 Declaration of PAUL D. MURPHY in Support of 182 Opposition/Response to Motion,, REDACTED DECLARATION OF PAUL D. MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S DISCOVERY ORDERS NO. 6 & 7; EXHIBITS filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 182 ) (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 182 RESPONSE (re 177 Ex Parte Application re 168 Special Masters Order, 169 Special Masters Order Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Enlarging Time to File Objections to the Special Master's Discovery Orders No. 6 & 7
September 15, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE by Language Line Services, Inc. re 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF LODGING CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF PAUL D. MURPHY (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 179 Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in Support of 177 Ex Parte Application re 168 Special Masters Order, 169 Special Masters Order Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Enlarging Time to File Objections to the Special Master's Discovery Orders No. 6 & 7
September 14, 2011 Filing 178 Declaration of Scott F. Cooper in Support of 177 Ex Parte Application re 168 Special Masters Order, 169 Special Masters Order Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Enlarging Time to File Objections to the Special Master's Discovery Orders No. 6 & 7
September 14, 2011 Filing 177 Ex Parte Application re 168 Special Masters Order, 169 Special Masters Order Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Enlarging Time to File Objections to the Special Master's Discovery Orders No. 6 & 7 filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 176 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Service's Motion to Dismiss Language Services Associates Inc.'s Counterclaim Under FRCP 12(B)(6) [Dkt no. 151] filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 175 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Service, Inc.'s and Third Party Defendant Bryan Lucas's Motion to Strike Counterclaim and Each Claim for Relief Therein Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Request for Attorneys' Fees [Dkt no. 153] filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 174 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Third Party Claims Against Bryan Lucas Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(2) and Motion to Transfer and Sever Claims [Dkt no. 149] filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 173 Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in Support of Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Service, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Counterclaim and Each Claim for Relief Therein Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16 filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 4), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 4), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 4), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 4), # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 172 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Counterclaims under FRCP 12(F) [Dkt. no. 154] filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 171 OBJECTIONS to re 150 Declaration in Support,, Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Steven M. Weinberg in Support of Plaintiff Language Line Service's Motions to Dismiss and to Strike Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(6) and CCP section 425.16 by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 170 STIPULATION CLARIFYING SCOPE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS IT RELATES TO DEFENDANT PATRICK CURTIN by Patrick Curtin, Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas, William Schwartz. (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 169 Special Masters Order Recommended Discovery Order #7. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 168 Special Masters Order Recommended Discovery Order No. 6. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING re 166 Stipulation, filed by Language Services Associates, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 166 Stipulation, 149 MOTION to Dismiss, 153 MOTION to Strike COUNTERCLAIM AND EACH CLAIM FOR RELIEF THERIN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, 152 MOTION to Dismiss LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6), 154 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS UNDER FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS UNDER FRCP 12(f). Responses due by 9/12/2011. Replies due by 10/3/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/24/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 166 STIPULATION re 157 Stipulation and Order, 156 Stipulation,,, JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S AND BRYAN LUCAS'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 164 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Leigh Ann Buziak (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 164 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY LEIGH ANN BUZIAK PRO HAC VICE ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611063083.) filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
July 15, 2011 Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 161 Declaration of PAUL D. MURPHY in Support of 158 MOTION FOR ORDER HOLDING DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC. IN CONTEMPT OF COURT FOR VIOLATION OF THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND AWARDING PLAINTIFF ITS ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AS A COMPENSATORY FINE filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 160 NOTICE by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas re 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S NOTICE OF LODGING CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF PAUL D. MURPHY (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 158 MOTION FOR ORDER HOLDING DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC. IN CONTEMPT OF COURT FOR VIOLATION OF THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND AWARDING PLAINTIFF ITS ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AS A COMPENSATORY FINE filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 7/20/2011. Replies due by 7/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 156 Stipulation,,, filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 156 STIPULATION re 153 MOTION to Strike COUNTERCLAIM AND EACH CLAIM FOR RELIEF THERIN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, 154 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS UNDER FRCP 12(f) MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS UNDER FRCP 12(f), 149 MOTION to Dismiss, 152 MOTION to Dismiss LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OPPOSITION AND REPLY BRIEFS TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S AND BRYAN LUCAS'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 155 NOTICE by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas re 150 Declaration in Support,, NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. WEINBERG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICE'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 154 MOTION to Strike PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS UNDER FRCP 12(f) filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 7/8/2011. Replies due by 7/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2011 Filing 153 MOTION to Strike COUNTERCLAIM AND EACH CLAIM FOR RELIEF THERIN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 7/8/2011. Replies due by 7/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark J. Nagle, # 2 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2011 Filing 152 MOTION to Dismiss LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.S COUNTERCLAIM UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 7/8/2011. Replies due by 7/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2011 Filing 151 Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTERCLAIMS UNDER FRCP 12(f)AND MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. to Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Ex. B to Request for Judicial Notice, # 3 Ex. C to Request for Judicial Notice, # 4 Ex. D to Request for Judicial Notice, # 5 Ex. E to Request for Judicial Notice)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 150 Declaration of Steven Weinberg IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, LLCS CROSS-COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Weinberg Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Weinberg Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Weinberg Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Weinberg Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Weinberg Declaration)(Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 7/8/2011. Replies due by 7/15/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bryan Lucas, # 2 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 6/24/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (sis, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2011 Filing 148 NOTICE by Language Line Services, Inc. of Withdrawal of Christopher J. Marino as Counsel for Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc. (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 147 NOTICE by Language Line Services, Inc. Change of Firm Affiliation for Counsel of Record (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting re 145 Stipulation To Extend The Time For Counter-Defendants To Respond To Counterclaims, filed by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/27/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 145 STIPULATION re 141 Counterclaim, STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR COUNTER-DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Language Line Services, Inc., Bryan Lucas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 144 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED on Third Party Defendant Bryan Lucas on 5/5/11 re 141 Third Party Complaint by Language Services Associates, LLC (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/24/2011) Modified on 5/25/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2011 Filing 143 Summons on a Third-Party Complaint Issued as to Bryan Lucas. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 142 ANSWER to SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Patrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Filing 141 COUNTERCLAIM against Language Language Line Services, Inc., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bryan Lucas. Filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011,(counsel failed to select multiple events.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Filing 140 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified text on 5/3/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2011 Filing 139 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Patrick Curtin, Language Services Associates, LLC, William Schwartz. Filed by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 *** 3/21/2011 Deadlines terminated per 138 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Denying 105 Motion to Dismiss; Granting in part and Denying in part 107 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 108 Motion to Strike. On or before April 8, 2011, Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint consistent with the terms of this Order, if so desired. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 17, 2011. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified text on 3/18/2011 (x2)(ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting 133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S 131 OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 5; DENYING 135 MOTION Application for Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding LSA's Objection to the Special Master's Discovery Order No. 5. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 15, 2011. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011) Modified text on 3/15/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 135 MOTION Application for Order Scheduling Hearing Regarding LSA's Objection to the Special Master's Discovery Order No. 5 re 131 Objection, filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Scheduling Hearing for LSA's Objection to Special Master's Discovery Order No. 5)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 134 NOTICE by Language Services Associates, LLC Notice of Lodging of Confidential Portion of Declaration of Starla Keith (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 133 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of The Declaration of Starla Keith in Support of LSA's Opposition to Language Line's Request for Determination by Special Master Re Jackson Memorial Hospital and Rush University Medical Center filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in support of Administrative Motion to File Portions of Keith Declaration Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 132 Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in Support of 131 Objection, REDACTED Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in support of LSA's Objection to Special Master's Discovery Order No. 5 filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 131 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 131 OBJECTIONS to re 127 Special Masters Order Discovery Order No. 5 Regarding Jackson Memorial Hospital and Rush University Medical Center by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objection and Overruling the Special Master's Discovery Order No. 5)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 130 REPLY (re 105 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byPatrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Nichols, Sarah) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 129 REPLY (re 108 MOTION to Strike 89 Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike 89 Amended Complaint ) Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Strike filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 128 REPLY (re 107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 127 Special Masters Order Discovery Order No. 5. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 126 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint, 105 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 108 MOTION to Strike 89 Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike 89 Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Lawrence C. Hinkle as Counsel for Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc. re 122 Notice (Other). Attorney Lawrence Curtis Hinkle, II terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/18/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Stephanie Chang Notice of Appearance of Colleen A. Carolan of Blank Rome LLP as Counsel for Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Stephanie Chang Notice of Appearance of Scott F. Cooper of Blank Rome LLP as Counsel for Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE by Language Services Associates, LLC of Withdrawal of Lawrence C. Hinkle as Counsel for Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 121 RESPONSE (re 105 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven M. Weinberg, # 2 Exhibit A to Weinberg Decl., # 3 Exhibit A to Weinberg Decl.)(Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 120 RESPONSE (re 107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint ) PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LSA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven M. Weinberg, # 2 Exhibit A to Weinberg Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Weinberg Decl.)(Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 119 RESPONSE (re 108 MOTION to Strike 89 Amended Complaint MOTION to Strike 89 Amended Complaint ) PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICE'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LSA'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(f) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting 117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott F. Cooper. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 117 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott F. Cooper ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008999.) filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S 111 OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 4. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 19, 2011. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified text on 1/20/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE by Language Line Services, Inc. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 Filing 114 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 111 OBJECTION TO THE SPECIAL MASTERS DECEMBER 22, 2010 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 4 filed by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration of Karen Gilhooly)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 1/6/2011) Modified on 1/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2010 Filing 113 MOTION for Hearing re 111 Objection, to the Special Master's December 22, 2010 Discovery Order No. 4 Denying Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Request for Recommendation That LSA Can Communicate With National Grid filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Scheduling A Hearing for Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objection to the Special Master's December 22, 2010 Discovery Order No. 4)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 12/31/2010)
December 31, 2010 Filing 112 Declaration of Cheryl S. Chang in Support of 111 Objection, to the Special Master's Discovery Order No. 4 Denying Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc,'s Request for Special Master's Recommendation That LSA Can Commnicate With National Grid filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 12/31/2010)
December 31, 2010 Filing 111 OBJECTIONS to re 110 Special Masters Order Discovery Order No. 4 Regarding National Grid by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Sustaining Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objection And Declining to Adopt The Special Master's December 22, 2010 Discovery Order No. 4)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 12/31/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 110 Special Masters Order Discovery Order No. 4. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 109 ERRATA to correct error re 105 MOTION to Dismiss by Patrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nichols, Sarah) (Filed on 12/10/2010) Modified on 12/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 56 Hearing pursuant to 106 Order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 9, 2010 Filing 108 MOTION to Strike Portions of 89 First Amended Complaint filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 12/9/2010) Modified on 12/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2010 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim upon relief may be granted. filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 12/9/2010) Modified on 12/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS CURTIN AND SCHWARTZS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION re 56 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Patrick Curtin, William Schwartz. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 9, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 9, 2010 Filing 105 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Patrick Curtin, William Schwartz. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Nichols, Sarah) (Filed on 12/9/2010) Modified on 12/13/2010,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 3/4/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTERS DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 2 re 96 Objection,, filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on December 7, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 103 Special Masters Order Discovery Order No. 3. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 96 Objection,, PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC.S OBJECTION TO THE SPECIAL MASTERS NOVEMBER 23, 2010 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 2 filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 96 ) (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 101 Memorandum in Opposition re 98 MOTION for An Order Scheduling A Hearing For LSA's Objection To The Special Master's November 23, 2010 Interim Report Granting Plaintiff Lang filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 100 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS Amended Complaint [FRCP 12(b)(2)] - by Patrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 11/29/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2010 Filing 99 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS Amended Complaint [FRCP 12(b)(2)]- filed by Patrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 11/29/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2010 Filing 98 MOTION for An Order Scheduling A Hearing For LSA's Objection To The Special Master's November 23, 2010 Interim Report Granting Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Request for Determination filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 11/29/2010) Modified on 11/29/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2010 Filing 97 Declaration of Lawrence C. Hinkle in Support of 96 Objection,, to the Special Master's November 23, 2010 Interim Report Granting Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Request for Determination filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 96 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 11/26/2010)
November 26, 2010 Filing 96 OBJECTIONS to re 94 Special Masters Order Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objection to the Special Master's November 23, 2010 Interim Report Granting Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Request for Determination by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Sustaining Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Objection And Declining to Adopt The Special Master's November 23, 2010 Interim Report)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 11/26/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d IN SUPPORT OF LANGUAGE LINE, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(2) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 90 ) (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 94 Special Masters Order Discovery Order #2. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 93 Declaration of STEVEN M. WEINBERG in Support of 90 Memorandum in Opposition, TO DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(2) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Related document(s) 90 ) (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 92 Declaration of ADRIAN JAWORSKI in Support of 90 Memorandum in Opposition, TO DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(2) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 90 ) (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 91 Declaration of KAREN GILHOOLY in Support of 90 Memorandum in Opposition, TO DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(2) filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 90 Memorandum in Opposition TO DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN'S 56 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES, INC.'S COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010,(LINK TO MOTION.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Filing 89 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Patrick Curtin, Language Services Associates, LLC, William Schwartz. Filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 87 Stipulation. Amended Complaint due by 11/23/2010. Motions terminated: 55 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint, 54 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint of Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc., 56 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 87 STIPULATION TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED RELIEF by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull re 80 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from the Presumptive Limits on Discovery to Take the Depositions of William Schwartz and Patrick Curtin re: Personal Jurisdiction. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 85 Reply Memorandum re 80 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE PRESUMPTIVE LIMITS ON DISCOVERY TO TAKE THE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION; M filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 84 Memorandum in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE PRESUMPTIVE LIMITS ON DISCOVERY TO TAKE THE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION; M filed byPatrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Nichols, Sarah) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 82 . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/6/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 82 Proposed Order STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 81 Letter from Steven M. Weinberg to Hon. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 80 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFF LANGUAGE LINE SERVICES INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE PRESUMPTIVE LIMITS ON DISCOVERY TO TAKE THE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; EXHIBIT filed by Language Line Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 79 Special Masters Order Report No. 2. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Plaintiffs motion to file under seal Exhibit 3 to the declaration of Steven M. Weinberg is granted. ORDER FINDING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 67 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re 69 Parties' Proposed Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/14/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull re 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Jurisdictional Discovery. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 74 Memorandum in Opposition re 71 Ex Parte Application FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RE: PERSONAL JURSDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS FILED SEPARATELY Doc #73] filed byPatrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 73 OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO 71 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT EXPEDITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Patrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010,(link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 Filing 72 Declaration of STEVEN M. WEINBERG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S 71 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 Filing 71 Ex Parte Application FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RE: PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY RE: PERSONAL JURSDICTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SCHEDULING ORDER: The 9/13/2010 Case Management Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Close of Discovery due by 12/19/2011. Last Date for Dispositive Motions due by 2/27/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 11/10/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please refer to the Court's Order re further scheduling specifics. None of the dates set in this Order may be changed without an order of the Court made after a motion is filed pursuant to the Civil Local Rules of Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 69 Proposed Order STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING THE USE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Meylan, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 68 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -- JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) AND N.D. CIVIL LOCAL RULE 16-9 filed by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Meylan, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 67 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Language Line Services, Inc. (Meylan, Robert) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT LSAS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; EXPANDING SCOPE OF APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER AND REFERRING MATTER TO SPECIAL MASTER by Judge James Ware denying 61 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 65 Declaration of STEVEN M. WEINBERG in Support of 64 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for Leave, or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider Prior Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7-9 filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Meylan, Robert) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 64 Memorandum in Opposition re 61 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File , Motion to Reconsider Prior Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7-9 filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Meylan, Robert) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 63 Declaration of Lawrence C. Hinkle in Support of 61 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File , Or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider Prior Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7-9 filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 61 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 62 Declaration of Art Seefahrt in Support of 61 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File , Or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider Prior Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7-9 filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 61 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Reconsider Prior Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7-9 filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/19/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2010 Filing 60 Special Masters Order No. 1. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 59 Special Masters Order Discovery Report No. 1. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 58 Declaration of PATRICK CURTIN in Support of 56 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed byPatrick Curtin. (Related document(s) 56 ) (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 57 Declaration of WILLIAM SCHWARTZ in Support of 56 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed byPatrick Curtin, William Schwartz. (Related document(s) 56 ) (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT filed by Patrick Curtin, William Schwartz. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 8/6/2010) Modified on 12/13/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint,, Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint of Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc. filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint of Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint of Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc. filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the Complaint of Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.)(Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 53 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/12/2010, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT Affidavit Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civl Prcoedure 53(b)(3) by Thomas HR Denver. (Denver, Thomas) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 26, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; NOMINATING SPECIAL MASTER. The Court nominates Tom Denver of Mediation Masters. The parties shall file any objections to Mr. Denver being named as Special Master on or before July 20, 2010. In their objections, the parties shall provide alternate nominations. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 13, 2010. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010) Modified text on 7/14/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 48 Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Non-evidentiary held on 7/12/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 7/12/2010). The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Curtis Hinkle, II Appearance of Counsel (Hinkle, Lawrence) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 46 Declaration of Leonard Deutchman in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Leonard Deutchman In Support of Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 45 Declaration of Lawrence C. Hinkle in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition Supplemental Declaration of Lawrence C. Hinkle In Further Support of Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY DECLARATION OF ANTHONY J. MERLINO IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF 3 LANGUAGE LINE'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byLanguage Line Services, Inc.. (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 7/8/2010) Modified on 7/12/2010 counsel failed to link entry to document #3 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2010 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Nagle OF MURPHY ROSEN & MEYLAN LLP (Nagle, Mark) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Murphy OF MURPHY ROSEN & MEYLAN LLP (Murphy, Paul) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Language Line Services, Inc.. William Schwartz served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. Proof of Service Summons in a Civil (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Language Line Services, Inc.. Patrick Curtin served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. Proof of Service Summons in a Civil (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Language Line Services, Inc.. Language Services Associates, LLC served on 6/16/2010, answer due 7/7/2010. Proof of Service Summons in a Civil (Weinberg, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re 36 Stipulation. Response due 8/6/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/6/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT LANGUAGE SERVICES ASSOCIATES, INC. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT re 35 Stipulation. Response due 8/6/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/6/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS WILLIAM SCHWARTZ AND PATRICK CURTIN TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Patrick Curtin, Language Line Services, Inc., William Schwartz. (Ochs-Tillotson, Danielle) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 35 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Language Services Associates, Inc. to Respond to Complaint of Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc. by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Marino (Marino, Christopher) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 33 REPLY BRIEF in support 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Language Line Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Merlino Declaration, # 2 Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Meylan, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2010) Modified on 6/28/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2010 Filing 32 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s 3 Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/24/2010) Modified on 6/24/2010(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2010 Filing 31 OBJECTIONS in support of 22 Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s 3 Application for Preliminary Injunction by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010) Modified on 6/24/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2010 Filing 30 Declaration of Lawrence C. Hinkle in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 29 Declaration of Brian T. Wolfinger in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 28 Declaration of Jim Pastore in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 27 Declaration of Eric Hope in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 26 Declaration of Dustin Graham in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 25 Declaration of Scott Coburn in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 24 Declaration of Laura Schriver in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 23 Declaration of Art Seefahrt in Support of 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Language Line Services, Inc.'s Application for Preliminary Injunction filed byLanguage Services Associates, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition to 3 Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by Language Services Associates, LLC. (Chang, Cheryl) (Filed on 6/23/2010) Modified on 6/24/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 06/14/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 ORDER. Opposition due by 6/23/2010. Reply due by 6/25/2010. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; GRANTING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. On or before June 16, 2010, Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with this Order along with Plaintiff's Application and all accompanying papers. On or before June 23, 2010, Defendants shall file their Opposition, if any. On or before June 25, 2010, Plaintiff shall file its Reply, if any. Hearing set for July 12, 2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/14/2010. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified text on 6/14/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. 19 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 18 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 17 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern California District Court) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Patrick Curtin, Language Services Associates, LLC, William Schwartz. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 15 RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. UNREDACTED Declaration of Steven Wrinberg in Support of Ex-parte Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/14/2010 (bw, Modified on 6/15/2010, *** (ABSENT OF A COURT ORDER.) *** (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Filing 14 RECEIVED UNDER SEAL. UNREDACTED Declaration of Bryan Lucas in Support of Order to Show Cause re: Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Preliminary Injunction by Language Line Services, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 6/15/2010, *** (ABSENT OF A COURT ORDER.) *** (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Filing 13 (Proposed) Order Granting 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/15/2010 (link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lodging Confidential Portions of the Declaration of Brian Lucas and Steven M. Weinberg by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 11 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal;The excel spreadsheet attached to Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brian Lucas in support of TRO and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction Exhibit A to the Declaration of Steven M. Weinberg in support of TRO and OSC re: Preliminary Injunction filed by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/14/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Filing 10 Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg in Support of Ex-parte Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Preliminary Injunction filed by Language Line Services, Inc. (Attachments: (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg, # 2 Exhibit B to Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg, # 3 Exhibit C to Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg, # 4 Exhibit D to Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg, # 5 Exhibit E (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) submitted under seal # 6 Exhibit F to Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg, # 7 Exhibit G to Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg, # 8 Exhibit H A to Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg, # 9 Exhibit I to Redacted Declaration of Steven Wrinberg) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/14/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Filing 9 Redacted Declaration of Bryan Lucas in Support of Order to Show Cause re: Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Preliminary Injunction re ( 3 )filed by Language Line Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) submitted under seal (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/14/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Filing 8 Declaration of Anthony J. Merlino in Support of Ex Parte Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction re [3 filed by Language Line Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Anthony J. Merlino) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 7 Declaration of Erin Munz in Support of Ex Parte Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction re [3 filed by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 6 Declaration of Karen Gilhooly in Support of Ex Parte Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction re 3 filed by Language Line Services, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of: (A) Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction filed by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 4 (Proposed) Order Granting Ex Parte Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order ; and (B) Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction re 3 by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2010 Filing 3 Ex Parte Application for: (A) Temporary Restraining Order; and (B) Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction filed by Language Line Services. Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties or Persons by Language Line Services, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for: (1) Trade Secret Misappropriation; (2) Conversion; (2) Breach of Confidence; (4) Breach of Fiduciary Duty; (5) Breach of Contract; (6) Unfair Business Practices; (7) Unfair Business Practices: (8) Intentional Interference with Contractual Relations; (9) Unjust Enrichment (Summons Issued) against Language Line Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611007524). Filed by Language Line Services, Inc (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Language Line Services, Inc. v. Language Services Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Language Line Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Meylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Language Services Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Curtin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?