Corona v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Irma Corona
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 5:2010cv02611
Filed: June 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER 46 for Dismissal With Prejudice, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/7/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER 44 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. FINAL CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/13/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER 42 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/2/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER 39 to Continue Case Management Conferencer: Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/3/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/3/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER 36 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/2/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER 31 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/29/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER 24 to Extend Deadline to Exchange Initial Disclosures. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/29/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER 22 to Continue Case Management Conference and Exchange Initial Disclosures. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/26/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part, with leave to amend, and denying in part, without prejudice, 8 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have twenty days leave to amend. With the exception of dealing with the adequacy of any amended complaint filed in response to the court's ourder, the action is stayed pending conclusion of United States v. Corona, CR 09-00083 PJH. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corona v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Corona
Represented By: George G. Benetatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?