Sunnergren v. Ahern et al
Plaintiff: Mark E. Sunnergren
Defendant: Gregory Ahern and George Arnold
Case Number: 5:2010cv02690
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of plaintiff at settlement conference on August 24, 2011. Signed by Magistarte Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 08/01/2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO PRO SE PRISONER SETTLEMENT PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/17/11. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of mailing)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 13 Motion to depose Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 certificate of mailing) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunnergren v. Ahern et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark E. Sunnergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ahern
Represented By: Sadhana Devi Narayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Arnold
Represented By: Sadhana Devi Narayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?