Williams v. Mumtaz et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Williams
Defendant: Tabbaa Mumtaz, N. Kushner, Robin Rodriguez, R. Muhammad, Darrin Bright and Sepalveda
Case Number: 5:2010cv02715
Filed: June 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 107 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Denying 108 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/10/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2012: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (ofr, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Denying 67 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying 69 Motion to Amend/Correct; Denying 76 Motion to Amend; Denying 79 Motion to Stay; Denying 96 Motion to Amend/Correct. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Against Unserved Defendants Without Prejudice, N. Kushner and R. Muhammad Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/25/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 49 Motion for Prelimiary Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request for Extension of Time to Locate Defendants Kushner and Muhammad. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/4/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADDRESSINGPENDING SERVICE MOTION by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 36 Motion for the Court to Direct the Marshal to Serve Kushner; Denying 27 Motion for Default. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Locate Unserved Defendants. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/25/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Motion to Amend Complaint; Directing Clerk to Issue Summons. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/22/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Partial Dismissal; Order of Service; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/30/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Mumtaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabbaa Mumtaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepalveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?