Grannan v. Alliant Law Group, P.C.
Plaintiff: Patrick Grannan
Defendant: Alliant Law Group, P.C.
Case Number: 5:2010cv02803
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/24/12. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INTERIM ORDER RE: 21 Stipulated Submission of Joint Request for Entry of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/16/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE re 18 . The deadline for mediation is extended to 7/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/19/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grannan v. Alliant Law Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Grannan
Represented By: Douglas James Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Law Group, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?