Felix v. Mayberg et al
Petitioner: Scott E. Felix
Respondent: S. Mayberg, P. Hedge and P. Vasquez
Case Number: 5:2010cv02823
Filed: June 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus;denying 44 Motion for Hearing (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting motion to dismiss as to claim 2 by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 31 Motion to Dismiss (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER VACATING HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/02/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
May 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Order to Show Cause.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Application for Extension of Time to File Response to Order to Show Cause.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/11/11. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of mailing)(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felix v. Mayberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott E. Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Mayberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Hedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?