Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) PTE. Ltd. v. IPtronics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) PTE. Ltd.
Defendant: IPtronics Inc. and IPtronics A/S
Case Number: 5:2010cv02863
Filed: June 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ORDER GRANTING 1003 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd. The Clerk shall close this file. ***ALL Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated: 856 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 841 MOTION Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testi mony of Hui Xu 948 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 852 MOTION to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Testimony of Michael Lebby 846 MOTION Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Harry Peterson [8 36] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 847 MOTION for Summary Judgment 998 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 837 MOTION Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of James Sevel 915 Administrati ve Motion to File Under Seal 860 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 858 854 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 1000 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Hearing Transcript 943 Administrative M otion to File Under Seal 900 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 892 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 853 MOTION Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony by Dr. Pedrotti 855 MOTION to Exclude C ertain Portions of the Expert Testimony of Michael Lasinski filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Lt d., 898 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Avago's Opposition to Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Sharon Hall filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Ava go Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd., 842 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Sharon Hall filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 850 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Avago's Expert Testimony Regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,359,447 filed by Mellanox Techn ologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 851 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Pedrotti filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 907 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to 447 Daubert Motion filed by Avag o Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd., 813 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion to Require Election of Expe rt Witnesses by Plaintiffs as Scheduled filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 952 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal R eply in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Sharon Hall filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 950 Administrati ve Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Hui Xu filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 895 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Defendants' Opposition to Avago's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 5,359,447 Under 35 U.S.C. 102 and No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 6,947,456 filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 889 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Re Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Portions of the Expert Testimony of Michael Lebby filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 845 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Harry Peterson filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc ., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 812 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, D, E, F and I to the Declaration of Xavier Brandwajn in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Enforce Court Order Re: Plaintiffs' Election of Expert Witnesses filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 956 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Av ago Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd., 838 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion to Exclude E xpert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 904 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Opposition t o Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd., 858 MOTION for Summa ry Judgment Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 844 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 Regarding its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies Internatio nal Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd., 902 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents re Avago's Opposition to Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Sevel filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Av ago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd., 954 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Techn ologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd., 894 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-11 and 79.5 Regarding Its Opposition to Moti on to Exclude Pedrotti filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) PTE Ltd.,, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd., 840 Administrative Motion to File U nder Seal Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Hui Xu filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 839 MOTION Daube rt Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 964 Administrative M otion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roy Weinstein filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellano x Technologies Ltd., 843 MOTION Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony of Sharon Hall filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IPTronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Tech nologies Ltd., 848 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert Motion by Defendants to Exclude Expert Testimony Relating to U.S. Patent No. 5,359,447 filed by Mellanox Technologies, Inc., Mellanox Technologies Denmark APS (fka IP Tronics A/S), IPtronics Inc., Mellanox Technologies Ltd., 967 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 849 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 888 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 946 Administrative Motion to F ile Under Seal Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/9/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016) Modified on 3/9/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 941 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting-in-part and denying-in-part 876 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 879 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 884 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 815 Motion to Strike. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
December 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 814 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2015)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER GRANTING SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 18, 2015, re 593 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR COSTS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 782 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 807 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 805 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 785 ; denying 803 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPLEMENTAL PETERSON EXPERTREPORT by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 786 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 790 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 787 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER denying 621 Motion for Partial Relief from Non-Dispostive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/27/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER VACATING ORDERS GRANTING ISSUANCE OF LETTER REQUESTS FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 28, 2015, re 760 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 765 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 24, 2015 re 737 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 742 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 736 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 720 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 705 ; denying 709 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 687 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 699 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 703 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 641 ; granting 642 ; granting 644 ; denying 645 ; denying 646 ; granting 649 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 674 ; denying 677 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 686 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS, granting 659 -1. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/5/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER RE: RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 3, 2015 re 659 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 637 REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERICAL MATTERS (REDACTED). Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/21/2015. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION RE: MOTION TO SEAL 632 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 15, 2015 re 633 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER re 621 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge Grewal (D.I. 609) filed by Avago Technologies U.S. Inc., Avago Technologies General IP (Singapor e) PTE Ltd., Avago Technologies International Sales PTE. Ltd., Avago Technologies Trading Ltd. Response due by 7/22/2015, not to exceed five pages in length. No reply brief shall be filed or considered. The Motion will then be deemed submitted for decision and the court will issue an order based on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/8/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015) Modified on 7/8/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 581 ; granting in part and denying in part 583 ; granting 585 ; granting 594 ; granting 596 ; granting 601 ; granting 610 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENFORCE PROSECUTION BAR AND REMEDY PROTECTIVE ORDER VIOLATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 546 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME, MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on June 10, 2015 re 597 , 598 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2015)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER denying 520 Motion for Relief from Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/4/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 542 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting-in-part and denying-in-part 563 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 541 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the preceding orders, the parties shall file on or before 2/10/2015, a stipulation and proposed order with revised scheduling deadlines since the parties' current proposal anticipates add itional claim construction proceedings. The schedule proposed by the parties should commence with a re-setting of the Trial Setting Conference and should conclude before the end of 2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 498 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO SHORTEN TIME, MOTIONS TO SEAL AND MOTION TO FILE SUR-REPLY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 462 ; denying 465 ; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 477 ; denying 479 ; granting 496 . (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 472 REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS (GERMANY), re 460 -1. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/19/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER Striking Joint Case Management Conference Statement. The court hereby STRIKES the parties' Joint Case Management Conference Statement. The court further orders the parties to file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement in compliance with this court's standing orders by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, 8/12/2014. signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/12/2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014) Modified on 8/12/2014 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REOPEN CASE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Having reviewed the Joint Notice filed June 26, 2014 (see Docket Item No. 385 ), and in light of the information contained therein, the Clerk is directed to REOPEN this file . The court schedules this action for a Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on August 15, 2014. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement which complies with this district's Standing Order for such statements on or before August 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/23/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER EXTENDING STAY AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court finds it appropriate to extend the previously-imposed stay. Accordingly the 2/7/2014 Case Management Conference is hereby VACATED and this case is STAYED in its entirety pendi ng final resolution of the ITC investigation, including any appeals. The parties shall submit a joint status report by no later than August 1, 2014 apprising the court of the status of the ITC investigation. The parties shall provide notice to the co urt within ten days of final resolution of the matter. In their notice, the parties shall request that this case be reopened and that a case management conference be scheduled. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 5, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014) Modified text on 2/5/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is scheduled for 2/7/2014 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/26/2013. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER granting 313 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 276 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 304 Motion to Strike signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/15/2013. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART MOTION TO DE-DESIGNATE AND MODIFY THE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 221 Motion for de-designation of product samples and modification of protective order (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Order Granting 318 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard Allan Horning; Imran A. Khaliq; Matthew Peter Larson; Arthur S. Beeman and Dana Johannes Finberg terminated. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 272 Motion for Protective Order; granting 283 Motion to Expedite (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' FIRST AND SECOND MOTIONS TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 232 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 248 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER Granting 270 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by IPtronics Inc., IPtronics A/S. Attorney Jimmy M. Shin terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 172 Motion for Leave to File. Any motion to seal any part of the new complaint must be made within 7 days of the date of this order. The Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint must be filed within 7 days of the ruling on any motion to seal, or within 14 days of the date of this order if no sealing motion is made. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/4/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-12 re 198 Stipulation filed by Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) PTE. Ltd. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 18, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 144 Motion for Protective Order (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/9/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Denying 79 Motion to Stay; Denying 86 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/28/2011 (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011) Modified text on 7/29/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AMENDED ORDER DENYING 109 Motion to Shorten Time. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the scheduling of this matter at the Case Management Conference on July 1, 2011. This amended order supersedes Docket Item No. 116. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/22/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 100 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 76 Stipulation filed by Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) PTE. Ltd., IPtronics Inc., IPtronics A/S. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 2, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting 37 Notice of Change In Counsel. The Court hereby permits the law firm Novak Druce + Quigg LLP to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. The law firm of Foley & Lardner LLP continues to serve as Plaintiff's counsel. Attorney Stephanie Renee Wood; Robert F. Kramer and Jerold I. Schneider terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Upon review of the parties' statement, the Court finds a conference unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the March 7 Case Management Conference. The Court will set a date for a furth er Case Management Conference in its Order following the Claim Construction Proceedings. In addition, upon review of the patents-in-suit, the Court GRANTS the parties' request for an additional fifteen minutes each to present their tutorials and an additional thirty minutes each for their claim construction presentation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER NOT RELATING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) PTE. Ltd. v. IPtronics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) PTE. Ltd.
Represented By: Robert F. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPtronics Inc.
Represented By: Dana Johannes Finberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPtronics A/S
Represented By: Dana Johannes Finberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?