Barrous et al v. BP P.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Maria Barrous and Demetrois Barrous
Defendant: BP P.L.C., BP Exploration and Oil, Inc., BP Corporation North America, Inc, ConocoPhillips Company and BP Products North America, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv02944
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on October 14, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 13, 2011 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on October 13, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 4, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Pre-Trial Conference re 167 Notice (Other) filed by Maria Barrous, Demetrois Barrous. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on October 4, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 3, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 65 , 84 , 78 , and 84 , Motions for Partial Summary Judgment; Terminating 101 Motion to File Additional Evidence; Terminating 112 Objections to Reply Evidence.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 30, 2011 159 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 99 , 109 Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
August 3, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting, AS MODIFIED, 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 65 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Punitive Damages. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 60 Stipulation to Continue Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/3/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 20, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 42 Proposed Order filed by BP Corporation North America, Inc, BP Exploration and Oil, Inc., BP P.L.C., ConocoPhillips Company, BP Products North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 19, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 14, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL; ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 5, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 Continuing ADR Deadline. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/5/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
February 17, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to May 18, 2011. re 40 . Further Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/17/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 31, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING ADR COMPLETION DATE pursuant to 38 . Signed by Judge Koh on 1/31/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 1/31/2011 (lhklc1, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 15 MOTION to Dismiss and 16 MOTION to Strike renoticed as Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/13/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
August 20, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 11 . Signed by Judge Koh on 8/20/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrous et al v. BP P.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Barrous
Represented By: Steven A. Ellenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrois Barrous
Represented By: Steven A. Ellenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP P.L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Hamerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration and Oil, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Hamerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Corporation North America, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Hamerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Hamerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?