Gonzales v. Leotti
Petitioner: Artemio Gonzales
Respondent: George Leotti
Case Number: 5:2010cv02963
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/25/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Denying Request for Stay; Requiring Election By Petitioner. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/30/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying Pending Motions; Order to Show Cause Why Petition Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Exhaust State Remedies by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Leotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Artemio Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Leotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?