Acclarent, Inc. v. Entellus Medical Inc
Plaintiff: Acclarent, Inc.
Defendant: Entellus Medical Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv03311
Filed: July 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT ENTELLUS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CHANGING DATES SET FORTH IN JANUARY 18, 2011 SCHEDULING ORDER re 22 . Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/31/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC 17 Stipulation, filed by Entellus Medical Inc Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/18/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER AND RESETTING CMC re 13 Stipulation, filed by Acclarent, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/22/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 11 Stipulation filed by Entellus Medical Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acclarent, Inc. v. Entellus Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acclarent, Inc.
Represented By: Roberta H. Vespremi
Represented By: Richard Blair Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entellus Medical Inc
Represented By: Matthew B. Lehr
Represented By: Michael Roland Petrocelli
Represented By: Jill R. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?