The Charles Schwab Corporation v. Banc of America Securities LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Defendant: Banc of America Securities LLC, Banc of America Funding Corporation, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03489
Filed: August 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 18 Motion to Remand.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 82 Motion for Leave to File, As Modified. Plaintiff May File a Sur-Sur-Reply Not to Exceed 3 Pages by 5 p.m. January 28, 2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 78 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011).
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to March 18, 2011 at 11 a.m., Pursuant to Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/25/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting Stipulation re Consolidated Reply. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/19/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Motion to Remand per Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/18/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010).
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/26/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Tentatively Granting Motion to Dismiss in Case 09-cv-01376. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/05/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Charles Schwab Corporation v. Banc of America Securities LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marc T. Dworsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?