Mendoza v. Citimortgage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Margoth Mendoza
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03550
Filed: August 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/24/2011. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 5 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend in part and with prejudice in part; denying 6 Motion to Strike as moot. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Vacating Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/21/2011. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Continuing Hearing, and Setting Deadline for Parties to File Either a "Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge," or Else a "Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment." Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Citimortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margoth Mendoza
Represented By: Wendell Jamon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Natilee S Riedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?