Salmon v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Salmon
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2010cv03636
Filed: August 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 16 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/21/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/21/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salmon v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Salmon
Represented By: Marc V. Kalagian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?