COLMAN v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Colman
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03637
Filed: August 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2010 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:10-cv-00877. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 25, 2010 Filing 8 LETTER dated August 25, 2010 from the U.S. District Court for Northern District of California requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (Their case number C10-3637 JW PVT - In Re: Google Inc. Street View Electronic Communications Litigation) (ks)
August 25, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER dated August 17, 2010 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable James Ware for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2184) (ks)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the parties' stipulation, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines are STAYED pending the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's ("JPML") determination of whether this case should be transferred. If the JPML determines that this case should not be transferred, defendant shall have thirty days from the date of the order denying transfer to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/6/2010. (lcjdb1)
July 1, 2010 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines by GOOGLE, INC.. (Roche, John)
July 1, 2010 Filing 5 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOOGLE, INC. (Roche, John)
June 9, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GOOGLE, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:10-cv-896. (Roche, John)
June 9, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION FILING by GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 JPML Motion for Transfer, # 2 Memorandum in Support of JPML Motion for Transfer, # 3 Schedule of Actions)(Roche, John)
June 9, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John K Roche on behalf of GOOGLE, INC. (Roche, John)
May 26, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GOOGLE, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616029990) filed by JEFFREY COLMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dr)
May 26, 2010 Summons (1) Issued as to GOOGLE, INC. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLMAN v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Colman
Represented By: Philip S. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: John K Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?