Galaxy Internet Services v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Galaxy Internet Services, Inc.,
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv03640
Filed: August 24, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case(mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
September 13, 2010 20 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/13/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/13/2010). The Court to issue further order following conference. (Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2010)
September 9, 2010 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Google Inc., David H. Kramer, Michael H. Rubin, Bart E. Volkmer and Caroline E. Wilson (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 3, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT in case 5:10-cv-02187-JW; denying (14) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:10-md-02184-JW. Deadline to file Joint Case Management Conference statement due by 9/7/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 26, 2010 17 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 24, 2010 16 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:10-cv-10871. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 24, 2010 Case transferred electronically to the Northern District of California pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 8/17/10.(Jones, Sherry)
August 24, 2010 15 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2184 received from the Northern District of California requesting electronic transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry)
August 23, 2010 14 Emailed Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2184 received from the mdl panel. (Jones, Sherry)
August 11, 2010 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Paine, Matthew)
August 11, 2010 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Conroy, James)
August 11, 2010 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GOOGLE, INC..(Conroy, James)
August 3, 2010 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GOOGLE, INC.. (Dyer, Jocelyn)
July 14, 2010 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Motion allowed and pre trial deadlines are stayed for 30 days or until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation rules, whichever shall first occur. The Court notes that it takes this action solely because plaintiff appears to have interposed no timely objection. The Court notes that it is fully prepared to move this case to a trial no later than September, 2011, a fact which counsel are ordered to bring to the attention of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. There shall be no further continuances re 9 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines (Paine, Matthew)
June 29, 2010 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re 9 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Conroy, James)
June 29, 2010 9 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines by GOOGLE, INC..(Conroy, James)
June 16, 2010 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David J. Burman. (Paine, Matthew)
June 15, 2010 8 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David J. Burman Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-2946464 by GOOGLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dyer, Jocelyn)
June 14, 2010 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines for GOOGLE, INC.. (Smith, Bonnie)
June 14, 2010 Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to answer (Smith, Bonnie)
June 14, 2010 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29, 2010 to to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by GOOGLE, INC.. (Conroy, James)
June 14, 2010 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29, 2010 to to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by GOOGLE, INC..(Conroy, James)
June 11, 2010 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jocelyn L. Dyer on behalf of GOOGLE, INC. (Dyer, Jocelyn)
June 10, 2010 4 NOTICE by GOOGLE, INC. of Filing with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Conroy, James)
June 10, 2010 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Conroy on behalf of GOOGLE, INC. (Conroy, James)
May 25, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to GOOGLE, INC.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cummings, Mary)
May 25, 2010 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Cummings, Mary)
May 25, 2010 1 COMPLAINT Galaxy Internet Services, Inc., et al against GOOGLE, INC. Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-2919406 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by GOOGLE, INC., Galaxy Internet Services, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carp, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galaxy Internet Services v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Burman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galaxy Internet Services, Inc.,
Represented By: Robert H. Carp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?