Marcus v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Aaron D. Marcus
Defendant: D. G. Adams and J. Akins
Case Number: 5:2010cv03805
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/18/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REOPENING ACTION; GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re 5 . (Instructions for Payment of Prisoner's Filing Fee Enclosed). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/3/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/25/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcus v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron D. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. G. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?