Heim v. The Estate of Donald T. Heim, Maxine Heim et al
Plaintiff: Mark Heim
Defendant: The Estate of Donald T. Heim, Maxine Heim and City of Watsonville
Case Number: 5:2010cv03816
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 254 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER GRANTING 245 JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER. Having carefully reviewed the Joint Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order, the court finds good cause for the relief requested. Accordingly, the Motion is GRANTED and the parties a re ordered to comply with the following amended schedule: Fact Discovery due by 2/27/2015. Expert Discovery cutoff 6/30/2015. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2015. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in Limine an d Exchange of Exhibits due by 10/16/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Selection set for 11/9/2015, 11/10/2015, 11/12/2015, 11/16/2015, 11/17/2015, 11/1 8/2015, 11/19/2015, 11/23/2015, 11/24/2015, 11/25/2015, 11/30/2015, 12/1/2015, 12/2/2015 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury deliberations set for 12/3/2015, 12/4/2015 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The court advises the parties that this is the final case schedule. All parties are expected to comply as directed above. This schedule will not be amended further absent the presentation ofgood cause necessitating such an amendment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/17/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Deadline to File Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2014. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2014. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. *** 9/5/2014 CMC Deadlines Terminated. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/2/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Interim Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement, Motions in Li mine and Exchange of Exhibits due by 3/13/2015. Voir Dire Questions, Proposed Jury Instructions, and Proposed Jury Verdict Forms due 3/17/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection s et for 4/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2015, 4/15/2015, 4/16/2015, 4/20/2015, 4/21/2015, 4/22/2015, 4/23/2015, 4/27/2015, 4/28/2015, 4/29/2015, 4/30/2015, 5/4/2015, 5/5/2015, 5/6/2015, 5/7/2015 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/30/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Conference, the court has determined a Case Management Conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for April 25, 2014, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/21/2014. ***4/25/2014 CMC Deadlines terminated. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting 192 Motion for Settlement; granting 201 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court schedules this case for a Case Management Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 4/25/2014 in order to determine what issues remain to be resolved and how the parties plan to proceed. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before 4/18/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 04/02/2014. (ejdlc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/2/2014 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 199 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 INTERIM ORDER re 199 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/20/2013. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER finding as moot 44 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended pleading must be filed within 30 days of the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/23/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting 123 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. William Burgstrom and Project One Limited Partnership only, are dismissed with prejudice from Maxine Heim's Second Amended Third Party Complaint. William Burgstrom/Project One terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/25/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER CONTINUING 1/27/2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. All deadlines previously imposed by the Scheduling O rder filed October 17, 2011 (see Docket Item No. 116 ) shall remain as set absent further order of the court based on a stipulation or administrative motion proposing an alternative schedule. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/24/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Order Granting 106 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice of Third Party Defendant JoAnn Webb as Representative of the Estate of Ernie Webb Only. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING 98 STIPULATION FOR FILING AMENDED ANSWER. Parties may resubmit this stipulation with the proposed amended pleading attached for the court's review. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/9/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING 92 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER Advancing the Case Managemnet Conference from 9/30/2011 to 9/23/2011 re 87 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. ***9/30/2011 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 82 Stipulation. The Multimatic Entities shall have until August 15, 2011, to respond to the Second Amended Third Party Complaint and First Amended Complaint of MAXINE HEIM and MARK HEIM, respectively. This extension will not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court order. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/2/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 80 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/19/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time of Multimatic LLC and The Kirrberg Corporation to Respond to Maxine Heim's Third Party Complaint re 41 Stipulation. Response due 5/27/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/16/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 11 extending time to respond to complaint. Initial case management conference continued to 12/7/2010, 1:30 PM. Related deadlines adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/27/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heim v. The Estate of Donald T. Heim, Maxine Heim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Heim
Represented By: Martin Robert Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Donald T. Heim, Maxine Heim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Watsonville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?