Marasco v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Michael R. Marasco
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2010cv03970
Filed: September 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME AND ORDER, re 38 Stipulation filed by Michael R. Marasco. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by February 17, 2012. Any opposition brief shall be filed by March 23, 2012. The reply shall be filed by April 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 1/9/2012. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/16/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING PLAINTIFF TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT, ORDER STAYING CASE UNTIL PLAINTIFF RECEIVES ATTORNEY APPOINTMENT. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 12/7/2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/23/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/4/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marasco v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Marasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?