Khan v. World Savings Bank, FSB
Plaintiff: Seema Khan
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Case Number: 5:2010cv04057
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Enlarging Time to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Mailing)(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss; Terminating 14 Motion to Strike as Moot; Ordering Plaintiff's Counsel to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Issue. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Mailing) (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011).
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's Opposition, or Statement of Non-Opposition, to the Amended Motion to Dismiss Due 12/13/2010. Defendant's Reply, if any, due 12/20/2010. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/18/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying Request to Substitute Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/3/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. World Savings Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seema Khan
Represented By: Wendell Jamon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?