Lasher et al v. City of Santa Clara
Plaintiff: Kulwant Lasher
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Case Number: 5:2010cv04173
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/13/12. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 36 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER to File Joint Case Management Statement by November 4, 2011 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/3/11. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Requiring Parties to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/14/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 14 Denying as moot Defendant's motion to dismiss. Defendant shall file its answer or motion to dismiss the amended complaint within twenty-one days of this Order. The April 28, 2011 motion hearing is vacated. The April 28, 2011 case management conference is continued to July 20, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/25/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 14, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasher et al v. City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kulwant Lasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?