J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Aviles et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Oscar A Aviles, Iris Mendoza, Nelis Mendoza and Reynaldo R Mendoza
Case Number: 5:2010cv04213
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 40 42 MOTIONS TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 17, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CORRECTED ORDER (1) DENYING 32 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND (2) GRANTING IN PART 24 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on May 17, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 26 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/31/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY OF DEFENDANT NELIS MENDOZA AND ORDER re 19 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/3/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 14 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER VACATING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 is CONTINUED to 2/4/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Aviles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar A Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelis Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynaldo R Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?