Yuan et al v. Maytag Corporation et al
Plaintiff: XingChao Chuck Yuan and Jackie Jie Yu
Defendant: Maytag Corporation, Whirlpool Corporation and Sears Roebuck and Co
Case Number: 5:2010cv04338
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice re 28 Stipulation filed by Maytag Corporation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/22/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM. Joint Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 12/6/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/20/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request for Mental Examination Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 35 re 24 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 10 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yuan et al v. Maytag Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XingChao Chuck Yuan
Represented By: Gary S. Rose, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Jie Yu
Represented By: Gary S. Rose, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maytag Corporation
Represented By: Bruce Grant Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Bruce Grant Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck and Co
Represented By: Bruce Grant Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?