Tessera, Inc. v. UTAC (Taiwan) Corporaiton
Plaintiff: Tessera, Inc.
Defendant: UTAC (Taiwan) Corporaiton
Case Number: 5:2010cv04435
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting 424 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice. All other pending matters are TERMINATED and VACATED. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/17/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER denying 239 , 294 Motions for Relief from Non-dispositive Pretrial Orders of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/15/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/30/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 356 Motion for Sanctions. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 11/19/2015, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/3/2015, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/13/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd Re: 366 Discovery Dispute Joint Report 17. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 368 Discovery Dispute Joint Report 18. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER denying 247 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge Edward J. Davila on September 30, 2015. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Reports 15 and 16 337 , 339 . (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER RE: (328 in 5:10-cv-04435-EJD, 8 in 5:15-cv-02543) SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. The court has carefully reviewed these actions and finds they are not related according to the requirements provided b y Civil Local Rule 3-12. Accordingly, these two cases shall not be related and a reassignment of cases to the undersigned shall not occur. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015) Modified text on 6/16/2015 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report #10 276 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/12/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 15-cv-02543 NC with 10-cv-04435 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/9/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report #13 290 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/4/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report #12 288 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/27/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER denying 234 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/26/2015. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015) Modified on 5/26/2015 (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report #11 280 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/20/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER RE MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE 294 Objection filed by Tessera, Inc. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 72-2, Defendant UTAC (Taiwan) Corporation shall file its written opposition to Plaintif f Tessera, Inc.s Motion for Partial Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge (Docket Item No. 294), if any, on or before June 5, 2015. Any opposition brief shall not exceed five pages in length. No reply brief shall be filed or considered. The Motion will then be deemed submitted for decision and the court will issue an order based on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/19/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report #9 278 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/30/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report #8 275 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/24/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute Joint Report #7 274 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/22/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER RE: 239 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Defendant shall file its written opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, if any, on or bef ore 3/6/2015. No reply brief shall be filed or considered. The Motion will then be deemed submitted for decision and the court will issue an order based on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/24/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING 258 Defendant's Request to Set up Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom for 2/19/2015 hearing filed by UTAC (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/19/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING 240 Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Tessera, Inc., Attorney Kevin Patrick Kiley terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/18/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Re: 193 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #5; 194 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/4/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER Re: 192 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/30/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Correcting PDF re 206 ). All scheduled dates remain as previously set in 206 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/21/2014. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER CONTINUING INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Interim Case Management Conference currently scheduled for 11/14/2014 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 11/21/2014. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/12/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT 181 ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on April 2, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/2/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 4/2/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER DENYING 128 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING 141 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [REDACTED VERSION]. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on March 31, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014) Modified text on 4/2/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 114 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #3. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on April 12, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline to file a discovery dispute joint report to April 16, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on April 9, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline to file a Discovery Dispute Joint Report to March 27, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on March 22, 2013. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court finds a Case Management Conference unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 3/1/2013 Case Management Conference is vacated. ***3/1/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER on 101 Discovery Letter Brief by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Case Schedule re 105 Stipulation filed by Tessera, Inc., UTAC (Taiwan) Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER on 102 Discovery Letter Brief by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order Granting 98 Stipulation Extending Case Schedule. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/30/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order Granting 96 Stipulation Extending Case Schedule. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/3/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER [REDACTION] to 76 ORDER (SEALED) by Judge Edward J. Davila GRANTING 50 Motion to Dismiss WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The amended complaint due on or before April l9, 2012. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/28/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE 71 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/13/11. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Attorney re 67 Notice (Other) filed by UTAC (Taiwan) Corporation. Attorney Brian Henzler VanderZanden terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Time For The Parties To File A Joint Case Management Statement re 46 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 5/9/2011. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ON TESSERA, INC.'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2010 is CONTINUED to 12/17/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/23/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tessera, Inc. v. UTAC (Taiwan) Corporaiton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tessera, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTAC (Taiwan) Corporaiton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?