Vendio Services, Inc v. P.S. Products, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Vendio Services, Inc
Defendant: P.S. Products, Inc and Billy Pennington
Case Number: 5:2010cv04455
Filed: October 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(A)(i). The Clerk shall close this file. ***Deadlines terminated re 31 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Request to Withdraw Motion; Vacate Hearing re 37 Stipulation. ***4/11/2100 Hearing terminated. Motions terminated: 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION to Continue the CMC and Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 35 Stipulation. The parties' proposed date for the hearing and the Conference extends the case beyond what the Court had anticipated when it gra nted the parties a Case Management conference meeting to discuss why this case should not follow the schedule as set forth in the Patent Local Rules. In addition, in light of the Court impending relocation of chambers to San Francisco, the Court would wish to address the pending dispositive Motion prior to the move. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 33 Stipulation. On or before 4/1/2011, the parties shall file a Joint Statement including, inter alia, a detailed explanation of the need for an exceptional schedu le, a good faith proposed schedule, and the specifics of this case with warrant such an exception. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/10/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to File Amended Complaint re 24 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint on or before 1/5/2011 as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Continue Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference from 12/20/2010 to 2/14/2011 re 18 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: Motion Hearing set for 2/14/ 2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/18/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vendio Services, Inc v. P.S. Products, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vendio Services, Inc
Represented By: Leslie A Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.S. Products, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?