Hale v. Northstar Location Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Bonnie J Hale
Defendant: Northstar Location Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv04473
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re 29 Stipulation filed by Bonnie J Hale. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 23, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 25, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Stipulation filed by Bonnie J Hale. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 18, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 16 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Northstar Location Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 4, 2010. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. Northstar Location Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie J Hale
Represented By: Christine Ann Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Location Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?