Naser v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Loay S Naser
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metlife Enterprise General Insurance Agency, Inc and Metlife Securities, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04475
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 12/6/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/18/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 11/15/2013. All other pretrial deadlines an d hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/4/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for a settlement conference to occur no later than 90 days from the date this order is filed. Counsel shall contact Judge Lloyd's Courtroom Deputy to arrange a date for the conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/2/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 71 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 94 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/31/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Granting 109 Stipulation Modifying Pre-Trial and Trial Dates. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 1/29/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff re 107 Notice (Other) filed by Loay S Naser. Attorney Barbara Giuffre terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/20/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Order Granting 69 Stipulation re Plaintiff's Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DISCOVERY ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on (67) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:10-cv-04475-EJD. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DISCOVERY ORDER filed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd allowing the parties to submit a Discovery Dispute Joint Report on Plaintiff's 4th Request for Production, no later than November 14, 2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on (62) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:10-cv-04475-EJD. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PRETRIAL ORDER (JURY TRIAL). Based on the parties' Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement (see Docket Item No. 60), the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the 7/6/2012 PreliminaryPretrial Confer ence is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule. Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 3/1/2013. Fact Discovery Cutoff 10/30/2012. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 11/23/2012. Final Pretria l Conference set for 3/15/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 3/25/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2013 0 1:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2013 01:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Tr ial set for 4/3/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2013 01:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edwa rd J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/9/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/9/2013 01:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2013 0 1:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/15/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/16/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/16/2013 01:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/17/2013 01:30 PM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2013 01:30 PM before Ho n. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/22/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/3/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT re 54 Stipulation. The Second Amended Consolidated Complaint is deemed filed as of March 7, 2012 (Docket Item No. 55). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/8/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER re 46 Stipulation. Responses by Metlife Securities, Inc., Metlife Enterprise General Insurance Agency, Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company due 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT AS TO 12 Joint Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Dismiss Defendant Nam Patel with Prejudice and to Consolidate this Action. This case is hereby consolidated with Case Number 5:10-CV-04475-EJD, such that 5:10-cv-4475 EJD is the lead case. The Clerk shall administratively close 5:11-cv-04046 EJD. On or before December 20, 2011, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint in light of the consolidation. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond no later than 21 days from the filing of the Amended Complaint. The court will imminently issue a separate order addressing further scheduling issues. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/6/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING 31 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on August 30, 2011. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ethan G. Zelizer. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Deadline to Hold Private Mediation re 19 Stipulation. Mediation deadline set for 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/10/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING PARTIES' STIPULATION re 13 Stipulation. Upon review, the Court does not find good cause to continue the January 24 Conference. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the parties' Stipulation. On or before January 14, 2011,the partie s shall file a Joint Case Management Statement. After reviewing the Joint Statement, the Court will consider the necessity of an appearance for the January 24 Conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naser v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loay S Naser
Represented By: Richard B. Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Enterprise General Insurance Agency, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metlife Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?