Facebook, Inc. v. Richter Featured Case

Facebook's lawsuit against Steven Richter. a Long Island, New York man accused of engaging in advertising activity that violates the company's Terms of Service, including creating and administering more than 43 fake FB profiles and 40 fake pages as part of an affiliate marketing scam. Richter is accused of CAN-SPAM Act violations, computer fraud, fraud, trademark dilution, breach of contract, tortious interference with contract, and false designation of origin.

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Steven Richter
Case Number: 5:2010cv04710
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2011 Filing 26 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT Re Steven Richter by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER re 23 . Signed by Judge Koh on 2/25/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Judgment re 22 . Signed by Judge Koh on 2/25/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 23 Proposed Order [Proposed] Consent Decree by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 22 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulation for Judgment by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 . Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/3/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 20 Joint Notice of Intent to Settle and [Proposed] Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 2/2/2011) Modified text on 2/3/2011 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2011 Filing 19 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing G. Gervaise Davis, III as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/21/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 20, 2011 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by defendant, Steven Richter (Hollman, Stephen) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Facebook, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 15 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 14 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 16 . *** STIPULATION and Proposed Order Selecting ADR Process by Facebook, Inc.. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Patrick Hennessy Notice of Change of Firm Address (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 6, 2010 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand bySteven Richter. (Hollman, Stephen) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 10 STIPULATION ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Facebook, Inc., Steven Richter. (Hollman, Stephen) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 11/30/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 8 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Facebook, Inc. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Text modified on 11/24/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 6 Proof of Service as to defendant Steven Richter served on 10/21/2010 by Facebook, Inc (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Modified on 11/3/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/21/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Steven Richter. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 3 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-16 by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Steven Richter ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008340). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 ExhibiC to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Perry Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?