Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund v. Andreessen et al
Plaintiff: Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund
Defendant: Lucille S Salhany, Marc L Andreessen, Joel Z. Hyatt, Robert L. Ryan, Mark V. Hurd, Rajiv L Gupta, John R Joyce, G. Kennedy Thompson, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Hewlett-Packard Company and John H. Hammergren
Petitioner: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System and Louis Levine
Case Number: 5:2010cv04720
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2014 Filing 108 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 107 MANDATE of USCA Appellants Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal is GRANTED. The appeal is hereby DISMISSED. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as the mandate of this court as to #103 Notice of Appeal filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER of USCA as to #103 Notice of Appeal filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
July 27, 2012 Filing 105 NOTICE of non designation of Transcripts Will Be Ordered (Box, Anne) (Filed on 7/27/2012) Modified on 7/27/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2012 Filing 104 USCA Case Number 12-16473 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/05/2012. Transcript ordered by 07/30/2012. Transcript due 08/27/2012. Appellant Saginaw Police & Fire Pension Fund opening brief due 10/09/2012. Appellees Marc L. Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbinio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L. Gupta, John M. Hammergren, Hewlett-Packard Company, Mark V. Hurd, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R. Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S. Salhany and G. Kennedy Thompson answering brief due 11/08/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. for #103 Notice of Appeal filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 28, 2012 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-6928541 paid.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Box, Anne) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs Complaint having been previously dismissed with leave to amend, and Plaintiff having now requested entry of judgment because it will not file an amended Complaint, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. The clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/29/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 25, 2012 Filing 101 RESPONSE to re Set Deadlines/Hearings by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Box, Anne) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 8, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 5/25/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE: AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendants motions to dismiss having been previously granted and the court having dismissed Plaintiffs Complaint with leave to amend, the court now orders that any amended complaint must be filed on or before 5/25/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/8/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING #98 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Attorney Jill Marie Baisinger terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/29/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 98 NOTICE by Hewlett-Packard Company Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Jill M. Baisinger (Sonnenfeld, Marc) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting #68 Motion to Dismiss; Granting #69 Motion to Dismiss; Granting #72 Motion to Dismiss; Denying #93 Motion for Leave to File . For the reasons discussed above, the court finds that Plaintiff has not plead particularized facts sufficient to prove that demand for any claim is excused. Therefore, Defendants motions to dismiss the Complaint for failure to state a claim are GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/21/2012 (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012) Modified text on 3/21/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2012 Filing 96 JOINDER in Oppositions to Plaintiff's #93 Motion For Leave to File A Surreply In Further Opposition To Defendants' Motions To Dismiss filed by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/13/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2012 Filing 95 OPPOSITION (re #93 MOTION for Leave to File SURREPLY IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS ) Nominal Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Sonnenfeld, Marc) (Filed on 2/27/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2012 Filing 94 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY filed by Mark V. Hurd. (Lewis, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/27/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2012 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File SURREPLY IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS *** Please note *** MOTIONS That WILL NOT PROMPT FOR A HEARING DATE are Motion for leave to file *** filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Surreply, #2 Proposed Order)(Box, Anne) (Filed on 2/22/2012) Modified on 3/13/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/13/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2012 Filing 92 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions to Dismiss(Docket Item Nos. #68 , #69 , #72 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 2/3/2012 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 2/3/2012 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
November 11, 2011 Filing 91 Declaration of Samuel M. Ward in Support of #90 Objection, filed byLouis Levine, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #90 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 11, 2011 Filing 90 OBJECTIONS to Motion to Consolidate (motion filed in Case Nos. CV-11-01058-EJD, Docket #39 and CV-10-03608-EJD, Docket #83) by Louis Levine, Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System. (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 89 OBJECTIONS to Motion to Consolidate (motion filed in Case Nos. CV-11-01058-EJD, Docket #39 and CV-10-03608-EJD, Docket #83) by Mark V. Hurd. (Lewis, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Bryan J. Ketroser in Support of Nominal Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's #87 Opposition to Copeland's Motion to Consolidate (motion filed in Case Nos. CV-11-01058-EJD, Docket #39 and CV-10-03608-EJD, Docket #83) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Ketroser, Bryan) (Filed on 11/10/2011) Modified on 11/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2011 Filing 87 OBJECTIONS to Motion to Consolidate (motion filed in Case Nos. CV-11-01058-EJD, Docket #39 and CV-10-03608-EJD, Docket #83) by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Ketroser, Bryan) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 86 REPLY (re #72 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss filed by Mark V. Hurd. (Lewis, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 Filing 85 Request for Judicial Notice re #84 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #84 ) (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 Filing 84 REPLY (re #69 MOTION to Dismiss And (B) Joinder In Support Of Nominal Defendant Hewlett- Packard Companys Motion To Dismiss; filed by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011,(redundant text) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 Filing 83 REPLY (re #68 MOTION to Dismiss ) Reply Brief in Support of Nominal Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Motion to Dismiss Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed byHewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit to the Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order)(Sonnenfeld, Marc) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 82 Request for Judicial Notice re #81 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byMark V. Hurd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #81 ) (Lewis, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 81 REPLY (re #72 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company and Director Defendants ) filed byMark V. Hurd. (Lewis, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING #78 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Allen Ruby for Lawrence T. Babbio,Allen Ruby for Sari M. Baldauf,Allen Ruby for Rajiv L Gupta,Allen Ruby for John H. Hammergren,Allen Ruby for Joel Z. Hyatt,Allen Ruby for John R Joyce,Allen Ruby for Robert L. Ryan,Allen Ruby for Lucille S Salhany,Allen Ruby for G. Kennedy Thompson added. Attorney James Elliot Lyons terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 79 Proposed Order re #78 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson. (Lyons, James) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by James Elliot Lyons (Lyons, James) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 77 RESPONSE (re #72 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company and Director Defendants, #68 MOTION to Dismiss, #69 MOTION to Dismiss And (B) Joinder In Support Of Nominal Defendant Hewlett- Packard Companys filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Box, Anne) (Filed on 9/19/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (redundant text)(cv, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Page Limits for Plaintiff's Opposition to Motions to Dismiss re #75 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/8/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 75 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Page Limit for Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Box, Anne) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER Establish Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss re #73 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #69 MOTION to Dismiss And (B) Joinder In Support Of Nominal Defendant Hewlett- Packard Companys #72 MOTION to Dismiss #68 MOTION to Dismiss. Oppositions due by 9/19/2011. Replies due by 10/11/2011. Motion Hearing previously set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/26/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011(redundant text) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2011 Filing 73 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Establish Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Box, Anne) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company and Director Defendants filed by Mark V. Hurd. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/2/2011. Replies due by 9/9/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett J. Waltzer , Thomas V. Christopher and Richard S. Horvath, Jr. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 70 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #69 Director Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint; Declaration of Richard S. Horvath, Jr. in Support of Request for Judicial Notice filed by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Lyons, James) (Filed on 8/15/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2011 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss And (B) Joinder In Support Of Nominal Defendant Hewlett- Packard Companys #68 Motion To Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lyons, James) (Filed on 8/15/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2011 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/29/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sonnenfeld, Marc) (Filed on 8/15/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Louise Box (Box, Anne) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
May 18, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Elliot Lyons (Lyons, James) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement, Report on Status of Investigation and Certain Defendants' Request for Additional Stay; [Proposed] Order filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sonnenfeld, Marc) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 27, 2011 Pursuant to the Order Reassigning Case all hearings on motions and further deadlines terminated and must be renoticed in front of newly assigned Judge.
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/25/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING LIMITED EXTENSION OF STAY re #62 . Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/25/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT Joint Statement Re: Status of Investigation and Certain Defendants' Request for 45 Day Stay; Proposed Order by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Sonnenfeld, Marc) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting #60 Request to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/17/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 60 Letter from Steven M. Schatz regarding request for extension of case management conference. (Schatz, Steven) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 10, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Leigh Henderson , Steven M. Schatz & Boris Feldman (Henderson, Katherine) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE FOR 45 DAYS re #57 . The Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/30/2011 remains in effect. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/3/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 57 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Stay Case for Forty -Five Days by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund of Withdrawal of Attorneys Arthur L. Shingler III and Luis E. Lorenzana (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #54 Extending Time to File Response to Complaint and to Establish Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/11/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 6, 2011 Filing 54 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint and to Establish Briefing Schedule by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Sonnenfeld, Marc) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 53 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Sonnenfeld (Sonnenfeld, Marc) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen A. Pieslak Pohlmann (Pohlmann, Karen) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Marie Baisinger (Baisinger, Jill) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #46 APPLICATION of Beth A. Kaswan for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Koh on 11/23/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #44 APPLICATION of Thomas L. Laughlin for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Koh on 11/23/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 47 Proposed Order re #46 APPLICATION of Beth A. Kaswan for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008581) by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 46 APPLICATION of Beth A. Kaswan for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008581) filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 45 Proposed Order re #44 APPLICATION of Thomas L. Laughlin for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008580.) by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 44 APPLICATION of Thomas L. Laughlin for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008580) filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #30 Application for Admission of Attorney Marc J. Sonnenfeld to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Koh on 11/22/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #28 Application for Admission of Attorney Karen Pieslak Pohlmann to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Koh on 11/22/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #26 Application for Admission of Attorney Jill Baisinger to appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Koh on 11/22/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark V. Hurd (Lewis, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hewlett-Packard Company Nominal Defendant Hewlett-Packard Company's Certification of Interested Entities Or Persons and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Kane, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeren Wei (Wei, Jeren) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Dwight Ludden Armstrong (Armstrong, Dwight) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Paul Bishop (Bishop, Keith) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence David Lewis (Lewis, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Wintersheimer Findley (Findley, Amy) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Alexander Kane (Kane, Kimberly) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 31 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Marc Sonnenfeld Pohlmann (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 30 Application for Admission of Attorney Marc J. Sonnenfeld to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008493) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 29 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Karen Pieslak Pohlmann to appear in Pro Hac Vice re #28 by Hewlett-Packard Company. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 28 Application for Admission of Attorney Karen Pieslak Pohlmann to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008493) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 27 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Jill Baisinger to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Hewlett-Packard Company. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 26 Application for Admission of Attorney Jill Baisinger to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008493) filed by Hewlett-Packard Company. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to file response and establishing briefing schedule re #21 . Signed by Judge Koh on 11/12/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. Service waived by Mark V. Hurd waiver sent on 10/29/2010, answer due 12/28/2010. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson re #22 Certificate of Interested Entities, #21 Stipulation, (Lyons, James) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson (Lyons, James) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 21 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order To Extend Time To File Response To Complaint And To Establish Briefing Schedule by Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson. (Lyons, James) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 11/09/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. 12/28/10 2:00 PM Case Management Conference VACATED. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 18 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Hewlett-Packard Company. (Webb, Diane) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila Anil Jambekar (Jambekar, Sheila) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin Brockway Gowdy (Gowdy, Franklin) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Leslie Webb (Webb, Diane) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 14 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Hewlett-Packard Complaint served on Lisa Brown, Authorized to Accept Service on 10/21/2010, filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/4/2010) Text modified on 11/4/2010 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Lawrence T. Babbio served on 10/23/2010, answer due 11/15/2010 by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Text modified on 11/3/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Lucille S Salhany served on 10/22/2010, answer due 11/12/2010 by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Text modified on 11/3/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant G. Kennedy Thompson served on 10/23/2010, answer due 11/15/2010 by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Text modified on 11/3/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant John R Joyce served on 10/23/2010, answer due 11/15/2010 by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Text modified on 11/3/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 9 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Joel Z. Hyatt served on 10/24/2010, answer due 11/15/2010 by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Text modified on 11/3/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 8 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant John H. Hammergren served on 10/24/2010, answer due 11/15/2010 by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Text modified on 11/3/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 7 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to defendant Rajiv L Gupta served on 10/23/2010, answer due 11/15/2010 by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Text modified on 11/3/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 6 Waiver of the Service of Summons Returned Executed filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. Service waived by Robert L. Ryan waiver sent on 10/29/2010, answer due 12/28/2010. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Modified on 11/3/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 5 Waiver of the Service of Summons Returned Executed filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. Service waived by Marc L Andreessen waiver sent on 10/29/2010, answer due 12/28/2010. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Modified on 11/3/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2010 Filing 4 Waiver of the Service of Summons Returned Executed filed by Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund. Service waived by Sari M. Baldauf waiver sent on 10/29/2010, answer due 12/28/2010. (Blasy, Mary) (Filed on 11/2/2010) Modified on 11/3/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/21/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes, #2 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, #3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Mark V. Hurd, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson, Hewlett-Packard Company. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 11/3/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Filing 1 Verified Shareholder Derivative COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Marc L Andreessen, Lawrence T. Babbio, Sari M. Baldauf, Rajiv L Gupta, John H. Hammergren, Mark V. Hurd, Joel Z. Hyatt, John R Joyce, Robert L. Ryan, Lucille S Salhany, G. Kennedy Thompson, Hewlett-Packard Company ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008348). Filed by Saginaw Police dn Fire Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 11/3/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund v. Andreessen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Louisiana Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Louis Levine
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saginaw Police and Fire Pension Fund
Represented By: David R. Scott
Represented By: Luis Erique Lorenzana
Represented By: Anne Louise Box
Represented By: Arthur L. Shingler, III
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucille S Salhany
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L Andreessen
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Z. Hyatt
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Ryan
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark V. Hurd
Represented By: Keith Paul Bishop
Represented By: Dwight Ludden Armstrong
Represented By: Amy Wintersheimer Findley
Represented By: Lawrence David Lewis
Represented By: Jeren Wei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajiv L Gupta
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Joyce
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Kennedy Thompson
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence T. Babbio
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sari M. Baldauf
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Represented By: Kimberly Alexander Kane
Represented By: Steven Mark Schatz
Represented By: Jill Marie Baisinger
Represented By: Franklin Brockway Gowdy
Represented By: Karen A. Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Diane Leslie Webb
Represented By: Sheila Anil Jambekar
Represented By: Bryan Ketroser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Hammergren
Represented By: James Elliot Lyons
Represented By: Garrett J. Waltzer
Represented By: Allen Ruby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?