Vancil et al
Plaintiff: Anita Vancil and Michael J Asture
Case Number: 5:2010cv04792
Filed: October 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/1/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. The matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/13/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Plaintiff's Time to File Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's summary judgment motion due by 4/19/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/18/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 extending deadline for plaintiff's summary judgment motion. Plaintiff's summary judgment motion due by 4/12/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/14/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vancil et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Vancil
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Asture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?