Gaos v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Paloma Gaos
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04809
Filed: October 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 Filing 95 Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 17-961 Filed on: 01/03/2018 Cert Petition Action 1: Pending (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
October 13, 2017 Filing 94 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 93 MANDATE of USCA as to 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by Theodore H Frank, Melissa Holyoak (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER of USCA The petition for panel rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc are DENIED. as to 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by Theodore H Frank, Melissa Holyoak (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION of USCA - AFFIRMED as to 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by Theodore H Frank, Melissa Holyoak (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
October 8, 2015 Filing 90 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc.. (Johnson, Edward) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
July 15, 2015 Filing 89 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 8/29/2014 before Judge Davila, (already available on docket) (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
April 29, 2015 Filing 88 USCA Case Number 15-15858 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by Theodore H Frank, Melissa Holyoak. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
April 27, 2015 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Theodore H Frank, Melissa Holyoak. Appeal of Order on Motion for Settlement,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 85 , Judgment 86 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9473634 paid.) (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 FINAL JUDGMENT and order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; granting 66 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards. The Clerk shall close this file upon entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/31/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 19, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ilan Chorowsky (Chorowsky, Ilan) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 19, 2015 Filing 83 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Anthony Bulgarelli (Bulgarelli, Mark) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
September 8, 2014 Filing 82 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/29/2014, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@sbcglobal.net. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2014. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Johnson, Edward) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 80 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2014 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 8/29/2014) re 65 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) filed by Paloma Gaos, 66 MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Costs filed by Paloma Gaos. Matter submitted. The Court to issue written order. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING 77 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/25/2014. (Correction of 77 PDF) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order Granting 76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Anne Schmidlin for Plaintiffs. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/25/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 *** FILED IN ERROR. INCORRECT PDF *** Order Granting 72 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 8/25/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified text on 8/25/2014 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2014 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Anne Schmidlin ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8867764.) filed by Paloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing)(Schmidlin, Anne) (Filed on 8/22/2014) Modified on 8/22/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2014 Filing 75 REPLY (re 65 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval), 66 MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Costs ) filed byPaloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Aschenbrener, # 2 Declaration Nassiri, # 3 Declaration Class Admin, # 4 Proposed Order Final Approval & Fees, # 5 Proposed Order Final Judgment)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 74 CLERKS SECOND NOTICE re: Failure to E-File document #71 Objection (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 20, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Administrative) filed by Paloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Proposed Order)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 73 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 71 OBJECTIONS to re 65 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) by Cameron Jan. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2014 Filing 70 OBJECTION (re 65 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval), 66 MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Costs filed by Theodore H Frank, Melissa Holyoak. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melissa Holyoak, # 2 Declaration of Theodore H. Frank)(Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 8/8/2014) Modified TEXT on 8/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Harold Frank on behalf of Objectors Melissa Holyoak and Theodore H. Frank (Frank, Theodore) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 5, 2014 Filing 68 OBJECTIONS to 65 Proposed Class Action Settlement by David Weiner. (Creamer, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2014) Modified on 8/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2014 Filing 67 OBJECTIONS to 65 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Kim Morrison. (Kurilich, Matt) (Filed on 8/5/2014) Modified on 8/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Costs filed by Paloma Gaos. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/8/2014. Replies due by 8/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Aschenbrener, # 2 Declaration Nassiri, # 3 Declaration Chorowsky, # 4 Declaration Class Admin, # 5 Declaration Dore, # 6 Declaration Gaos, # 7 Declaration Italiano, # 8 Declaration Priyev, # 9 Proposed Order for Final Approval and Fees, # 10 Proposed Order Final Judgment)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval) filed by Paloma Gaos. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/8/2014. Replies due by 8/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Aschenbrener Declaration, # 2 Declaration Nassiri Declaration, # 3 Declaration Chorowsky Declaration, # 4 Declaration Class Admin Declaration, # 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Final Approval and Fees, # 6 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment Order)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT by Paloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kassra P. Nassiri, # 2 Declaration of Randall W. Edwards)(Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
March 26, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 63 Order on Motion for Settlement: Motion Hearing re Final Approval of Class Action Settlement set for 8/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. A hearing on the final approval of class action settlement shall be held on August 29, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/26/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
September 16, 2013 Filing 62 Received Letter from Marc Rotenberg Executive Director Electronic Privacy Information Center. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 13, 2013 Filing 61 Declaration of Kassra P. Nassiri in Support of 52 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval), 53 Declaration in Support filed byPaloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 52 , 53 ) (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order Granting 59 Stipulation for Extension to File Supplemental Materials. The deadline to file the supplemental information requested at the August 23, 2013 Preliminary Approval Hearing is extended until September 13, 2013. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/10/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Stipulated Request for Extension of Deadline to File Supplemental Materials filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Randall W. Edwards in Support of Stipulated Request, # 2 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 58 Received Document Letter by Electronic Privacy Information Center dated 8/28/13. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 27, 2013 Filing 57 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/23/2013, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 email: Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2013. (Related documents(s) 54 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT ORDER - by Google Inc. for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Johnson, Edward) (Filed on 8/26/2013) Modified on 8/28/2013 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2013 Filing 55 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2013 before Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 8/23/2013) re 52 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed by Paloma Gaos. The Court requested revised proposed order and forms submitted by September 6, 2013. Matter submitted on September 6, 2013. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Paloma Gaos for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 53 Declaration of Michael Aschenbrener in Support of 52 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed byPaloma Gaos. (Related document(s) 52 ) (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 52 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed by Paloma Gaos. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/2/2013. Replies due by 8/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration - Aschenbrener, # 2 Exhibit Declaration - Chorowsky, # 3 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 4 Exhibit Declaration - Simmons, # 5 Exhibit Declaration - Nassiri, # 6 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER as Modified by the Court Granting 50 Stipulation of Class Actions. Before consolidation, the clerk shall relate case numbers 5:10-cv-04809 EJD and5:13-cv-00093 LHK and reassign the latter to the undersigned. The clerk shall then administratively close case number 5:13-cv-00093 once reassigned. The pending motion to dismiss filed in case number 5:10-cv-04809 EJD (Docket Item No. 44) is TERMINATED AS MOOT in light of the forthcoming consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/30/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Consolidation of Class Actions filed by Paloma Gaos. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 49 CLERKS NOTICE. The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 48 MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative) filed by Paloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order & Stipulation)(Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
September 19, 2012 Filing 47 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss (Docket Item No. 44 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 9/21/2012 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 9/21/2012 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
August 2, 2012 Filing 46 REPLY Reply in Support of Google Inc.'s 44 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Revised [Proposed] Order (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 8/2/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2012 Filing 45 RESPONSE (re 44 MOTION to Dismiss / Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) ) filed byPaloma Gaos. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
June 15, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss / Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/29/2012. Replies due by 7/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Randall W. Edwards in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Edwards Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Edwards Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Edwards Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Edwards Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Edwards Declaration, # 7 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
May 31, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings as to 43 Order: Motion to Dismiss due by 6/15/2012. Opposition due by 7/19/2012. Reply due by 8/2/2012. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING SECOND 42 Stipulated Request For Order Changing Time For Motion To Dismiss Briefing. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/31/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Stipulated Request For Order Changing Time For Motion To Dismiss Briefing filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Randall W. Edwards In Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order Granting 40 Stipulation to Extend Time For Filing Motion To Dismiss and Stipulated Request For Order Changing Time For Motion To Dismiss Briefing. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2012.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER / Stipulation to Extend Time For Filing Motion To Dismiss and Stipulated Request For Order Changing Time For Motion To Dismiss Briefing filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Randall W. Edwards in Support of Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against All Defendants. Filed byPaloma Gaos. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Hon. Edward J. Davila GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 29 Motion to Dismiss. with leave to amend as to all other claims. Gaos may file any amended complaint no later than May 1, 2012. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2011 Filing 37 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/28/2011, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2012. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Statement of Recent Decision)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 35 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2011 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 10/28/2011) re 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google Inc. The Court took the motion under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 34 REPLY (re 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 33 Declaration of Kassra P. Nassiri in Support of 32 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPaloma Gaos. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 32 RESPONSE (re 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) ) filed byPaloma Gaos. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bradley M. Baglien. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
May 16, 2011 Filing 30 Declaration of Jean B. Niehaus in Support of 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Niehaus, Jean) (Filed on 5/16/2011) Modified on 5/16/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 28 Joint Case Management Statement (attorney name spelling corrected) by Paloma Gaos. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 5/6/2011) Modified text on 5/9/2011,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2011 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Paloma Gaos. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 26 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc.. Filed by Paloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Baglien, Bradley) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2011 Pursuant to the Order Reassigning Case all hearings on motions and further deadlines terminated and must be renoticed in front of newly assigned Judge.
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge James Ware no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/25/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. On or before May 2, 2011, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint consistent with the terms of this Order.Signed on 4/7/2011.(jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011) Modified text on 4/8/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 Filing 23 REPLY (re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 22 RESPONSE (re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) ) filed byPaloma Gaos. (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brad Baghen ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056170.) filed by Paloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 20 Declaration of Jean B. Niehaus in Support of 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 19 ) (Niehaus, Jean) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 17 Stipulation filed by Google Inc. Response due 2/10/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/31/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 27, 2011 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Google Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher L. Dore. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Aschenbrener. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher L. Dore ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008700.) filed by Paloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Aschenbrener ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 5461108701.) filed by Paloma Gaos. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re 11 Stipulation. Response due 1/27/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 11 STIPULATION /Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Google Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re 7 Stipulation. Response due 12/17/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 8 Statement /Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Google Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 7 STIPULATION / Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Google Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paloma Gaos re 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued (Dillingham, Michael) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 5/27/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/25/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paloma Gaos (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Google Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) jury demand against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008371.). Filed by Paloma Gaos. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010) (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaos v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paloma Gaos
Represented By: Michael James Aschenbrener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?