Robles v. Lucky Brand Dungarees, Inc.
Plaintiff: Juvenal Robles
Defendant: Lucky Brand Dungarees, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv04846
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 10, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF LITIGATION PENDING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. This litigation is stayed to and including October 5, 2012. In the event that plaintiffs have not filed a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement on or before October 5, 2012, the stay shall be lifted and the parties shall file on that date a further Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF LITIGATION PENDING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. This litigation is stayed to and including September 21, 2012. The parties are directed to file, no later than September 21, 2012, a Joint Status Report, said deadline to stand vaca ted without further order of the Court in the event plaintiffs have filed, on or before September 21, 2012, a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF LITIGATION PENDING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. This litigation is stayed to and including September 7, 2012. The parties are directed to file, no later than September 7, 2012, a Joint Status Report, said deadline to stand vacate d without further order of the Court in the event plaintiffs have filed, on or before September 7, 2012, a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF LITIGATION PENDING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. This litigation, including amended pleading deadlines, motion deadlines, and all discovery obligations, is stayed for a period of 35 days from the date of this order. The parties are directed to file, no later than August 22, 2012, a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER STAYING LITIGATION PENDING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. This litigation shall be stayed for a period of 45 days from the date of this order. The parties are directed to file, no later than July 13, 2012, a Joint Status Report , said deadline to stand vacated without further order of the Court in the event plaintiffs have filed, on or before July 13, 2012, a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 30, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/26/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW D. PRINS PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 22, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DIRECTING RGAR HOLDINGS, LLC TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 10, 2012 to March 23, 2012 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference is continued from January 20, 2012 to February 10, 2012. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 3, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PETER L. WINIK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 33 ). The Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 is CONTINUED to 6/24/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/10/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 30 . Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/13/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 27 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/14/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 . Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/24/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles v. Lucky Brand Dungarees, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juvenal Robles
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Brand Dungarees, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?