Holomaxx Technologies Corporation v. Microsoft Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Holomaxx Technologies Corporation
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation and Return Path, Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv04924
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2010 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Holomaxx Technologies Corporation (Syverson, Erik) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 10, 2010 4 Proof of Service as to defendant Return Path Incorporation re 1 Complaint, 2 Summons Issued by Holomaxx Technologies Corporation (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
October 29, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2010. Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Corporation, Return Path, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Microsoft Corporation, Return Path, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008407). Filed byHolomaxx Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holomaxx Technologies Corporation v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holomaxx Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Erik Swen Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Return Path, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?