Weber v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jason Weber
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv05035
Filed: November 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Jason Weber. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with prejudice. by Jason Weber (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of Google's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re 43 Stipulation. Motions terminated: 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google, Inc. Joint Status Report due by 11/23/2011. Status Conference set for 12/2/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/26/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 Filing 43 STIPULATION to Withdrawal of Google's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) and Request For Status Conference 33 by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CHANGE TIME AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS re 41 Stipulation. Opposition due by 10/7/20 11. Reply due by 10/28/2011. Motion Hearing re 33 Motion to Dismiss set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2011. Case Management Conference set f or 12/2/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 41 STIPULATION by Jason Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Stampley, # 2 Proposed Order)(Stampley, David) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT GRANTING Request for Enlargemnt of Briefing Schedule and Resetting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss, Case Management Conference re 39 Stipulation filed by Jason Weber, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 39 Stipulation, 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Opposition due by 10/7/2011. Reply due by 10/28/2011. Motion Hearing re 33 Motion to Dismiss set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 26, 2011 Filing 39 STIPULATION requesting enlargement of briefing schedule by Jason Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration D.Stampley i/s/o Request, # 2 Proposed Order)(Stampley, David) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 **** Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Opposition due by 8/26/2011. Reply due by 9/16/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 37 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/25/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) Modified to create linkage on on 7/26/2011 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 Filing 37 STIPULATION re 35 Joint Case Management Statement by Jason Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of D. Stampley in support of Request, # 2 Proposed Order)(Stampley, David) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Randall W. Edwards (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 35 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jason Weber. (Stampley, David) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 34 Declaration of Brynly R. Llyr in Support of Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) 33 filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Llyr Declaration)(Llyr, Brynly) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 32 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE Resetting Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 09:00 AM; Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2011 10:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 26, 2011 Pursuant to the Order Reassigning Case all hearings on motions and further deadlines terminated and must be renoticed in front of newly assigned Judge. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/25/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 29 Declaration of Brynly R. Llyr in Support of 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 28 ) (Llyr, Brynly) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 26 against Google, Inc.. Filed byJason Weber. (Stampley, David) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 26 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 27 . *** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, Inc.. Filed byJason Weber. (Stampley, David) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 3/17/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATED REQUEST TO MODIFY DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/4/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 25, 2011 Filing 24 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Google, Inc.. Amendment to 23 Proposed Order Revised [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time. (Llyr, Brynly) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 23 Proposed Order re 22 Stipulation Request for Order Changing Time by Jason Weber. (Stampley, David) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 22 STIPULATION Request for Order Changing Time by Jason Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of David A. Stampley in support of Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time)(Stampley, David) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 18 APPLICATION of Scott A. Kamber for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 16 APPLICATION of David A. Stampley for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 19 Proposed Order re 18 APPLICATION of Scott A. Kamber for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009046) by Jason Weber. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Scott A. Kamber for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009046) filed by Jason Weber. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Filing 17 Proposed Order re 16 APPLICATION of David A. Stampley for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009046) by Jason Weber. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Filing 16 APPICATION of David A. Stampley for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611009046) filed by Jason Weber. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DATE OF MOTION HEARING Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 14 Declaration of Jean B. Niehaus in Support of 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Niehaus, Jean) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 2, 2011 Filing 11 Statement Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Google, Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
January 28, 2011 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Google, Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 1/12/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 7 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 11, 2011 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Google, Inc. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 Filing 5 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re ( 1 ) by Google, Inc.. (Edwards, Randall) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Linkage added on 12/27/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney for Plaintiff by Avi Melech Kreitenberg (Kreitenberg, Avi) (Filed on 11/12/2010) Modified on 11/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Judge Howard R. Lloyd Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes, # 2 Standing Order for San Jose Division Judges, # 3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Google, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611052616). Filed by Jason Weber. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weber v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Weber
Represented By: Scott A Kamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?