Lifetouch National School Studios, Inc. v. Moss-Williams
Plaintiff: Lifetouch National School Studios, Inc.
Defendant: Kimberly Moss-Williams
Case Number: 5:2010cv05297
Filed: November 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT REPORT #2. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/15/13. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER 90 to Reschedule CMC. Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/28/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER 66 to Vacate Trial Date: Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/20/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 INTERIM ORDER RE: 65 DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT REPORT #2. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/18/2012. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE 44 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/17/11. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER APPROVING 50 STIPULATION TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING MOTION 33 FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 25, 2011. (jflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND ORDER re 32 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/20/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 . Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/2/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 11 , Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/22/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifetouch National School Studios, Inc. v. Moss-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifetouch National School Studios, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan B. Carp
Represented By: Mark Slater Askanas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Moss-Williams
Represented By: Burton F. Boltuch
Represented By: Michael G Zatkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?